Ergo Sleep Systems, LLC
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Charles Novack |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40723 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2017 |
Debtor
Ergo Sleep Systems, LLC
PO Box 305
Pinole, CA 94564-0305 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Paul Mansdorf
1569 Solano Ave. #703
Berkeley, CA 94707 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 03/16/2017 12:02 AM PDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/15 6:10 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Case Upload 17-40723 [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27309293, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Wed 03/15 6:10 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/26/2017 at 09:00 AM at Oakland U.S. Trustee Office. (Johnson, Chad) |
||
1 | 1
caseupld
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - Case Upload
Wed 03/15 6:09 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 335. filed by Chad M. Johnson of Bankruptcy Law Group, PC on behalf of Ergo Sleep Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Chad) |