Johnson v. Transdev Services Incorporated
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00769 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:36 AM MST |
Defendant
Transdev Services Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 07/27 9:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Order (Doc.20 ), the Civil Case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 06/20 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Transdev Services Incorporated. (King, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 06/20 2:15 PM
ORDER - This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on July 19, 2017 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/20/2017. (ATD) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Mon 06/19 4:34 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 6/19/2017 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: The parties participated in a settlement conference as ordered. The parties participated in good faith. All issues as to all parties are resolved. Counsel for Defendant shall file a Notice of Settlement in two (2) business days. A Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice shall be filed within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. APPEARANCES: G. Gregory Eagleburger for and with Plaintiff John Johnson. Daniel Fritz and James Foster for Defendant Transdev Services Incorporated and appearing with Client Representative Phil Isaacs. Settlement conference held 1:37 PM to 4:17 PM. A court report was not present, nor was the conference digitally recorded. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 06/01 4:24 PM
ORDER vacating Telephonic Status Conference set for June 16, 2017 at 4:30 p.m. The remainder of the Court's Order (Doc.14 ) is affirmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 6/1/2017. (ATD) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 05/31 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John M Johnson. (Eagleburger, G) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 05/16 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John M Johnson. (Eagleburger, G) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 05/02 6:15 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Services Incorporated. (Fritz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/21 12:21 PM
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference - Settlement Conference set for 6/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett.(See order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/21/17. (SLQ) Modified on 4/21/2017 (SLQ) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 04/14 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Services Incorporated. (Foster, James) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 04/12 11:29 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Conference held on 4/11/2017. Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Motion for summary judgment due by 7/14/2017. Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett randomly drawn to conduct settlement conference. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:15 PM to 3:28 PM.(TCA) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Wed 04/05 1:51 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion for Daniel G Fritz of McMahon Berger granted on behalf of Transdev Services Inc. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report - Other
Fri 03/31 11:10 AM
REPORT of Joint Case Management Report by Defendant Transdev Services Incorporated. (Foster, James) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 03/22 1:11 PM
ORDER RE EMPLOYMENT PROTOCOLS. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/22/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/21 2:00 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/21 1:59 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James N Foster Jr. on behalf of Transdev Services Incorporated. (BAS) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Tue 03/21 2:00 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183475 as to James N Foster, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 03/16 11:44 AM
ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/16/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/16 11:28 AM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Transdev Services Incorporated.(King, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 11:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transdev Services Incorporated. (King, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Wed 03/15 1:43 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/15/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 8:06 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Transdev Services Incorporated. (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 03/15 8:04 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14014509. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00769 PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 7:59 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-052675. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14014509 filed by Transdev Services Incorporated.(submitted by Daniel King)(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Removal | ||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 8:03 AM
*****State Court Record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by John M Johnson: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Exhibits upon Transdev Services Incorporated on 2/21/17*****Docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes***** (EJA) |