MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated v. Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00770 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:00 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Joan Hardaway
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly Harris
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yvette Jackson
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephen Jones
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Kaplan
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deanna Ramsey
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wadell Ridley
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Spencer
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terri Wiedeman-Rouse
Terminated: 05/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/25 3:46 PM
ORDER granting43 Stipulation of Dismissal. Defendant John Spencer's Motion for Attorneys' Fee (Doc.31 ) is withdrawn. This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/25/17. (EJA) |
|
43 | 43
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/25 2:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice and Withdrawal of Motion for Attorneys' Fees by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (Agins, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/05 2:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (Agins, Richard) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Mon 07/03 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:39 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. The Coroporate Disclosure Statement submitted is blank. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please fill out the required fields and refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 06/30 5:16 PM
ORDER granting38 Stipulation Further Extending Time in which Plaintiff may Answer Defendants' Counterclaims and Motion for Attorneys' Fees: Plaintiff's Answer due 8/1/17. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/30/2017. (MMO) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/30 10:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (Agins, Richard) |
|
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/30 10:24 AM
STIPULATION re:35 Order on Stipulation Further Extending Time in Which Plaintiff May Answer Defendant ACT's Counterclaims and Defendant Spencer's Motion for Attorneys' Fees by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated.(Agins, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 06/20 3:40 PM
ORDER that the Stipulation for Extension of Time36 is granted. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference scheduled for July 6, 2017 is reset to August 8, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for filing a Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and a Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order, as outlined in the Court's June 1, 2017 Order Setting a Rule 16 Case Management Conference32 , is extended to July 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 6/20/17.(CLB) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Extension of Time to File Document Continue
Tue 06/20 11:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and a Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order , MOTION to Continue the July 6, 2017 Case Management Conference by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School.(Munnelly, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 06/02 2:43 PM
ORDER granting34 Stipulation: Plaintiff shall have until July 1, 2017, to file an answer to Defendant Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School's Counterclaim (Doc. 30) and a Response to Defendant John Spencer's31 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/2/2017. (MMO) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/02 10:18 AM
STIPULATION re:30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Request for Entry of Judgment by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (Agins, Richard) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/01 8:08 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (CLB) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 06/01 7:53 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 7/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/31/17.(CLB) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Case Management Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 05/31 3:42 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Request for Entry of Judgment by John Spencer.(Wagner, Milton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 05/31 1:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand AND COMPLAINT , COUNTERCLAIM against MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School.(Munnelly, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Change Venue Order on Motion for Ruling Order on Motion for Judgment
Thu 05/18 9:46 AM
ORDER that Defendant's Request to Summarily Grant its Motion26 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/18/17.(CLB) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 05/17 10:45 AM
ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue8 is denied. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss7 is granted in part. Deanna Ramsey, Joan Hardaway, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Terri Wiedeman- Rouse, Wadell Ridley, and Kimberly Harris are dismissed from the action with prejudice. Count IV of the Complaint will be dismissed, as will Paragraph D of Plaintiff's prayer for relief. Defendant John Spencer's Motion to Dismiss22 is granted. He will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/17/17. (CLB) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/16 12:37 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse. (Munnelly, James) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Change Venue Ruling Judgment
Tue 05/16 12:32 PM
MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania , MOTION for Ruling re:8 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case re: Motion to Transfer Venue to Eastern District of PA , MOTION for Judgment Summarily Grant Motion to Transfer Venue by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse. (Munnelly, James) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 05/01 3:36 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (Agins, Richard) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/27 1:55 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice the23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/27/17.(CLB) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 04/24 12:43 PM
EX PARTE MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (Agins, Richard) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/21 7:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Spencer.(Wagner, Milton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/14 10:45 AM
ORDER that the Stipulation20 is granted. Plaintiff MGRM Pinnacle, Inc. shall have until May 1, 2017, to file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss7 . Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/14/17. (CLB) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/13 3:03 PM
STIPULATION re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (Agins, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
Tue 04/04 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Richard H Agins. (Agins, Richard) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/03 12:30 PM
ORDER that the Court's Order13 is discharged and no further action will be taken by the Court at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant John Spencer shall have until April 21, 2017 to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/3/17. (CLB) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Vacate
Fri 03/31 5:58 PM
MOTION to Vacate13 Order to Show Cause by John Spencer.(Wagner, Milton) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 2:39 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 2:38 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James J Munnelly on behalf of Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, and Terri Wiedeman-Rouse. (BAS) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Wed 03/29 2:38 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183726 as to James J Munnelly. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/28 8:59 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse. (Garner, David) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/27 9:28 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff must show cause in writing why Defendant John Spencer should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute no later than March 31, 2017, unless a responsive pleading pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is filed within such time. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/27/17. (CLB) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/24 3:10 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/24 3:08 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kevin M McKenna on behalf of Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, John Spencer, and Terri Wiedeman-Rouse. (BAS) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Fri 03/24 3:09 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183587 as to Kevin M McKenna. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 9:07 AM
NOTICE re: Service by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse re:5 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Garner, David) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 03/22 8:41 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Case Proposed Order by Defendants Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse. (Garner, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/21 5:35 PM
MOTION Transfer Venue by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse.(Garner, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 03/21 5:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse.(Garner, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Errata
Fri 03/17 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Errata re:1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Yvette Jackson, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, John Spencer, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse. (Garner, David) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Thu 03/16 8:03 AM
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/15/17. (CLB) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 4:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated. (KGM) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 03/15 4:00 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14015919. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00770 SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KGM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/15 3:33 PM
DECLARATION of David Garner re:1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Kimberly Harris, Stephen Jones, Lisa Kaplan, Deanna Ramsey, Wadell Ridley, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse (submitted by David Garner). (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-090136. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14015919 filed by Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School, Joan Hardaway, Lisa Kaplan, Terri Wiedeman-Rouse, Kimberly Harris, Stephen Jones, Wadell Ridley, Deanna Ramsey (submitted by David Garner).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:38 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Achieving Community Transformation Academy Cyber Charter School on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:42 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Yvette Jackson on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:45 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Joan Hardaway on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:47 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Terri Wiedeman-Rouse on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:49 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Lisa Kaplan on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:51 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Stephen Jones on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:53 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Wadell Ridley on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:55 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon John Spencer on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Wed 03/15 3:56 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/14/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by MGRM Pinnacle Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint, Exhibits 1 & 2 upon Kimberly Harris on 2/13/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/14/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |