JSH Time LLC v. Maricopa County Flood Control District et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John W Sedwick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00772 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:33 AM MST |
Defendant
Arizona State Land Department
|
|
Defendant
Lisa A Atkins
|
|
Defendant
Maricopa County Flood Control District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenneth Proksa
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Wiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JSH Time LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 08/28 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated per29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action
Thu 08/24 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Status Report Order
Tue 08/01 6:42 PM
TEXT STATUS REPORT ORDER. The court has reviewed the notice at docket 27. Unless closing papers are sooner filed, a status report shall be filed in 63 days. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JWS) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 07/31 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 06/06 11:52 AM
ORDER - The Court, having received and reviewed the Parties Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings25 and finding that the parties have complied with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.3 and there being no objection, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the deadline for the Defendants to file their responsive pleadings from June 13, 2017, to August 14, 2017. Should the parties reach a settlement prior to August 14, 2017, the Plaintiff shall notify the Court of the settlement and file the necessary Notice of Dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/6/17. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Fri 06/02 8:39 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Maricopa County Flood Control District, Kenneth Proksa, William Wiley.(Vigil, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Fri 06/02 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph I Vigil on behalf of Maricopa County Flood Control District, Kenneth Proksa, William Wiley. (Vigil, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/01 5:15 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JSH Time LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verification, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp - with Conformed stamp, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause, emails regarding no documents 5, 9, 10 upon Lisa A. Atkins, State Land Commissioner, Arizona State Land Department on 05/24/2017. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
22 | 22
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/01 5:11 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JSH Time LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verification, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp - with Conformed stamp, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause, emails regarding no documents 5, 9, 10 upon William Wiley, Chief Engineer and General Manager of the Maricopa County Flood Control District on 05/25/2017. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
21 | 21
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/01 5:09 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JSH Time LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verification, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp - with Conformed stamp, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause, emails regarding no documents 5, 9, 10 upon Maricopa County Flood Control District, by serving the Clerk of the Board of Supervisors on 05/24/2017. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
20 | 20
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/01 4:41 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JSH Time LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verification, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp - with Conformed stamp, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause, emails regarding no documents 5, 9, 10 upon Arizona State Land Department, by serving the State Attorney General on 05/24/2017. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
19 | 19
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/01 4:38 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JSH Time LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verification, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp - with Conformed stamp, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause, emails regarding no documents 5, 9, 10 upon Maricopa County Flood Control District, by serving the Clerk of the Board of Supervisors on 05/24/2017. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
18 | 18
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/01 4:34 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JSH Time LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verification, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp - with Conformed stamp, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause, emails regarding no documents 5, 9, 10 upon William Wiley, Chief Engineer and General Manager of the Maricopa County Flood Control District on 05/25/2017. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
17 | 17
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/01 4:29 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JSH Time LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verification, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp, Consent to exercise jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge -Signed by Matthew Klopp - with Conformed stamp, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause, emails regarding no documents 5, 9, 10 upon Kenneth Proksa on 05/25/2017. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/19 8:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/18 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/18 9:30 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/18 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/18 9:27 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/18 9:24 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 04/03 8:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John W Sedwick. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-17-772-PHX-JWS. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 24, 2017 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Mon 04/03 8:36 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))
Thu 03/30 12:16 PM
Order that JSH Time LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/24/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 03/20 2:31 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 3/20/17. (KGM) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 03/15 2:16 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint by Plaintiff JSH Time LLC. (Klopp, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Wed 03/15 12:27 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re:1 Complaint filed by JSH Time LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 03/15 12:25 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14016672. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00772 DMF. Magistrate Election form attached.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/15 12:23 PM
VERIFICATION of Tom Giblock by JSH Time LLC re:1 Complaint. (KGM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 12:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JSH Time LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cyclone Wind LLC for JSH Time LLC (submitted by Matthew Klopp). (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14016672 filed by JSH Time LLC (submitted by Matthew Klopp).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |