Baldonado v. Holbrook, City of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-08052 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:40 AM MST |
Defendant
Raymond Alley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holbrook, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Louis Baldonado, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/14 8:48 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation of dismissal (Doc.46 ) is granted. This case is dismissed with prejudice as to all claims against Defendants. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/14/18. (SLQ) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/01 7:18 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of.(Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 01/29 12:02 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that this case has settled. Doc. 44 . IT IS ORDERED: 1. This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. 2. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. 3. All pending motions are found to be moot. 4. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on March 1, 2018 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/29/18. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Fri 01/26 2:57 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Settlement Conference held on 1/26/2018. The parties reached an agreement and the essential terms of the settlement agreement were placed on the record. LATER: The parties are directed to file dismissal paperwork with the Court within 30 days. APPEARANCES: Eduardo Coronado for Plaintiff. Aaron Arnson and Justin Pierce for Defendants. Hearing held 11:54 AM to 11:57 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 12/22 1:49 PM
ORDER. Telephone Conference regarding Pre-Motion for Summary Judgment letters set for 1/30/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a conference call to include all counsel and the Court. If a dial-in number is to be used, counsel for Plaintiff shall email all counsel and the Court with the dial-in information no later than noon on 1/29/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) |
|
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 12/22 1:01 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Plaintiff's pre-motion for summary judgment letter to 1/26/2018. Dispositive motions are due 2/23/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/2017.(DGC, nvo) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 12/21 2:24 PM
NOTICE re: Service by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of .(Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
Thu 12/21 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Aaron Dean Arnson. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 12/21 10:46 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time Motion For Extension of Time by Louis Baldonado, Jr.(Coronado, Eduardo) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
7
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 11/30 9:40 AM
ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Each party shall provide the Court with the original of that party's Settlement Conference Memoranda, at least, seven business days before the Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference Memoranda shall NOT be filed with the Clerk. See attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 11/29/2017. (KAS) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 11/16 4:06 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion (Doc.36 ) is granted. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns for purposes of conducting a settlement conference. The parties shall jointly call Judge Burns' chambers on or before November 27, 2017 for purposes of scheduling a settlement conference. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/16/17.(SLQ) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Request
Wed 11/15 2:47 PM
REQUEST re: Joint Request for Referral to US Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference by Defendants Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of.(Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/06 11:35 AM
NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Records Subpoena by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of .(Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 10/31 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 10/27 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Deposition
Thu 10/19 7:25 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Amber L. Hill, filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Deposition
Thu 09/14 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Raymond Alley, filed by Louis Baldonado, Jr. (Coronado, Eduardo) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 09/14 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions
Wed 09/13 12:27 PM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/15 6:47 PM
NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Records Subpoenas by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of .(Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/11 9:30 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline (good faith settlement talks) to 9/7/2017. Joint report due 9/14/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/11/2017.(DGC, nvo) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/10 3:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Hold Good Faith Settlement Talks by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of.(Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Deposition
Thu 08/10 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Louis Baldonado Jr., filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 08/07 3:37 PM
ORDER denying21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff seeks an additional 90 days to produce an expert report despite having stipulated to an original deadline in June and being granted a 30-day extension by the Court until July. Plaintiff does not explain why the deadline or extended deadline could not be met through reasonable diligence, particularly since the first claim in this case was made in September 2016. To avoid prejudice from the filing of this motion, the Court will permit Plaintiff to file the expert report required by Rule 26 by August 25, 2017, with the response report due on September 29, 2017, any rebuttal report due on October 20, 2017, and expert depositions to be completed by November 17, 2017. All other provisions of the Case Management Order will remain in effect. Plaintiff is advised that further extensions will not be granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8-7-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/31 12:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Expert Witnesses filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of, Unknown Party. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Deposition
Fri 07/28 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Louis Baldonado, Jr., filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of, Unknown Party. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 07/27 1:28 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Expert Witnesses by Louis Baldonado, Jr.(Coronado, Eduardo) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 06/27 9:57 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Amend/Correct. All other deadlines in the court's case management order16 remain in effect. The Court will not grant further extension to the case management deadlines absent truly extraordinary circumstances. The parties have not shown good cause or extraordinary circumstances in their motion to amend. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/27/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 06/23 3:10 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Experts by Louis Baldonado, Jr.(Coronado, Eduardo) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 06/15 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 06/07 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/25 4:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Dispositive motions due by 1/26/2018.Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/25/2017. (TCA) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Thu 05/25 11:22 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 5/25/2017. Discussion held. Deadlines discussed. Court will enter a case management order. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Eduardo Coronado for Plaintiff. Justin Pierce for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 11:03 AM to 11:09 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/23 4:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, Scheduling Conference RESET TIME ONLY for 5/25/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Wed 05/17 12:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/05 1:49 PM
AMENDED ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order amended to reflect correct time of hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/5/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 04/05 10:11 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonic at the Rule 16 Case Management Conference on 5/25/2017 at 3:30 p.m. Counsel located out of the Phoenix area may appear telephonically at the Rule 16 Case Management Hearing by calling the Court's chambers no later than 5 minutes prior to hearing time. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/5/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear
Tue 04/04 5:28 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic by Louis Baldonado, Jr.(Coronado, Eduardo) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 04/04 3:01 PM
ORDER re Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 04/04 2:45 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL - The Honorable Paul G. Rosenblatt recuses himself from this action and that this action is reassigned by automated random selection to the Honorable David G. Campbell for all further proceedings. All future documents filed and/or served in this action shall be captioned with case number CV 17-08052 PCT-DGC. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 04/04/17. (KAS) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/24 7:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 17-8052 PCT-PGR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Fri 03/24 7:46 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/21 10:30 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of.(Pierce, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 03/15 11:34 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Notice of Removal Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. (Arnson, Aaron) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Wed 03/15 11:10 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Raymond Alley, Holbrook, City of. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 03/15 11:09 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14015519. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-08052 PCT-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to return the attached Magistrate Election form, in paper, within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Navajo County Superior Court, case number CV2017-00019. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14015519 filed by Holbrook, City of, Raymond Alley (submitted by Justin Pierce).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |