Mitchell v. Shartle
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Bernardo P Velasco |
Referred: | Bernardo P Velasco |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00119 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Mon 10/01 12:23 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filedOctober 1, 2018, judgment is entered in favor of respondents and against petitioner. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 10/1/2018. (MCO) |
|
13 | 13
7
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/01 11:57 AM
ORDERED Petitioner Scottie Ellis Mitchell's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (Doc.1 ) is DENIED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 10/1/2018. (MCO) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Habeas Minute Order - Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Mon 08/28 4:09 PM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have a Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV17-119-TUC-BPV. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DPS) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Habeas - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 08/28 4:07 PM
Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DPS) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 08/02 12:26 PM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter Petitioner's change of address. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Petitioner at the above address a copy of the Court's July 6, 2017 Order (Doc.5 ) and Respondent's Return and Answer and accompanying exhibits (Doc.9 ); and the date on which Petitioner may file a reply to Respondent's Return and Answer is extended to September 11, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 8/2/2017. (SIB) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Response to Habeas Petition (Fed/2241)
Mon 07/31 11:29 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by JT Shartle.(Foss, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/24 12:54 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Order, Complaint, Summons upon U.S. Attorney General on 7/17/2017. (MFR) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 07/19 2:18 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Scottie Ellis Mitchell. Reason for return: No Longer At This Address. Document number5 . (SIB) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/06 3:39 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Summons, the Petition (Doc.1 ), and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General and to Respondent. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bernardo P. Velasco for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 7/6/2017. (see Order for complete details)(SIB) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Habeas - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Fri 04/07 3:08 PM
Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DPS) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 03/15 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (FKD) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 1:56 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Scottie Ellis Mitchell. (3 pages) (FKD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)
Wed 03/15 1:55 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Scottie Ellis Mitchell. (26 pages)(FKD) |
|
Att: 1 envelope |