Rosalita Williams v. D2 Management LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02049 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
D2 Management LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Rosalita Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 04/24 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Rosalita Williams. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 04/19 6:50 PM
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson: Generally, defendants must answer the complaint within 21 days after service (60 days if the defendant is the United States). Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1). In the present case, it appears that this time period has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before May 1, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of CivilProcedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff's response. Failure to respond to this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to dismissal of thecomplaint. (jy) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/13 7:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rosalita Williams, upon Defendant D2 Management LLC served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Serrati, Registered Agent in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
10
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/17 7:51 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 1:43 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant D2 Management LLC. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 9:25 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Rosalita Williams. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 9:24 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rosalita Williams, (Kent, Trinette) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 9:23 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rosalita Williams. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:21 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19517113 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rosalita Williams. (Attorney Trinette Gragirena Kent added to party Rosalita Williams(pty:pla))(Kent, Trinette) |