Martin Vogel v. Vito Simplicio et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02052 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Livia Simplicio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vito Simplicio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Vogel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 08/17 10:37 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel.(Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 08/08 5:20 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter: In the Notice of Settlement filed on 8/8/2017, Dkt. No.21 , the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before 9/22/2017. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until September 22, 2017. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. 9Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Settlement
Tue 08/08 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 05/19 3:47 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. ( Bench Trial set for 12/19/2017 at 08:30 AM and Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter.) (jloz) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Fri 05/19 3:44 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on June 5, 2017 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 5, 2017. (jloz) |
|
18 | 18
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)
Fri 05/19 9:30 AM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel(Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 05/19 9:28 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel.. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/11 1:41 PM
TEXT ENTRY ORDER STRIKING Notice of Unavailability15 . The Court does not recognize notices of unavailability from counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/11 11:02 AM
*stricken* NOTICE of Unavailability filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) Modified on 5/11/2017 (sr) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/24 4:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/5/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 5/22/2017. (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/20 3:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Livia Simplicio, Vito Simplicio, (Magnanimo, Frank) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/20 2:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Livia Simplicio, Vito Simplicio.(Attorney Frank A Magnanimo added to party Livia Simplicio(pty:dft), Attorney Frank A Magnanimo added to party Vito Simplicio(pty:dft))(Magnanimo, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 10:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel, upon Defendant Vito Simplicio served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vito Simplicio, Trustee, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 10:14 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel, upon Defendant Livia Simplicio served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Livia Simplicio, Trustee, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Thu 03/16 2:35 PM
STANDING ORDER. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp) |
|
8 | 8
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/16 2:17 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 12:00 p.m. on March 17, 2017. Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 1:25 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Livia Simplicio, and Vito Simplicio. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 10:03 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 10:03 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel, (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 9:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:52 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19517444 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Attorney Scottlynn J Hubbard, IV added to party Martin Vogel(pty:pla))(Hubbard, Scottlynn) |