Music War and Love, LLC v. Ozma Productions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02065 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Martha Coolidge
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Directors Guild of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ozma Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Music War and Love, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 08/04 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Music War and Love, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Price, Dylan) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 06/09 10:13 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION AND PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Stay Case17 (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Stay Case
Thu 06/01 6:20 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Arbitration filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc..(Schecter, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 04/20 11:40 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer,15 . Refer to the Court's Order for specifics. (pso) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/19 11:48 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc..(Schecter, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Wed 03/22 1:50 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/21 12:14 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 12:09 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 03/20 5:41 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 4/24/2017 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc..(Schecter, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 03/20 1:35 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-cv-01251 DSF(ASx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02065 DSF(ASx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/15 5:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Related Case(s)5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on 3/15/2017. (Schecter, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/15 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-01251-DSF-AS (Schecter, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 2:43 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc. identifying No Corporate Parent as Corporate Parent. (Schecter, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 2:39 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc., identifying Only interested parties are Plaintiff and Defendants. (Schecter, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 2:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Martha Coolidge, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Ozma Productions, Inc.. (Schecter, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC650532 Receipt No: 0973-19520539 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Directors Guild of America, Inc., Martha Coolidge, Ozma Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel Scott Schecter added to party Martha Coolidge(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Scott Schecter added to party Directors Guild of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Scott Schecter added to party Ozma Productions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schecter, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Order Granting Motion to Intervene, | ||
Att: 3 Complaint in Intervention, | ||
Att: 4 State Court - Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 1:41 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Martha Coolidge, Ozma Productions, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Music War and Love, LLC. Filed in State Court on 2/14/17 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
cmp
Intervenor Complaint
Thu 03/16 1:47 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION filed in State Court on 3/14/17 by Defendant Directors Guild of America, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (car) |