Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02072 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Joint Apprenticeship Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Health and Welfare Fund
Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young & Cutler 16501 Ventura Blvd., Suite 304
Encino, CA 91436 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Individual Retirement Account Defined Contribution Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Pension Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Eleven Counties Cement Masons Vacation Savings Plan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
judgmentCV
Judgment - Default by Judge
Mon 07/31 10:06 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Pursuant to the Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment14 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Individual Retirement Account (Defined Contribution) Trust, Board of Trustees of the Eleven-Counties Cement Masons Vacation Savings Plan, and Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Joint Apprenticeship Trust, and against Defendant Klassic Engineering Construction, Inc. in the following amounts: $5,913.58 in unpaid contributions; $1,965.29 in interest; $635.59 in liquidated damages; $1,051.45 in attorneys' fees; and $467.16 in costs. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (gk) |
|
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 07/31 10:00 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment14 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall recover from Defendant Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc. $8,514.46 in unpaid contributions, interest thereon, and liquidated damages, plus $1,051.45 in attorney's fees and $476.16 in costs. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
16 | 16
minutes
Motion Hearing Default Judgment
Fri 07/28 11:53 PM
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dolly M. Gee RE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc., a California Corporation14 . There is no appearance by or on behalf of Defendant. The Court invites counsel to respond to the tentative ruling. Plaintiff's counsel submits to the tentative ruling. Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc., a California Corporation is hereby GRANTED. A written order and judgment will issue. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 06/14 11:27 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Joint Apprenticeship Trust, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Individual Retirement Account Defined Contribution Trust, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Eleven Counties Cement Masons Vacation Savings Plan, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc., a California corporation14 served on 06/14/2017. (Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 06/14 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc., a California corporation filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Joint Apprenticeship Trust, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Individual Retirement Account Defined Contribution Trust, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Eleven Counties Cement Masons Vacation Savings Plan. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Michael Jolly, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 14 Declaration Nicholas Starkman, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/15 4:24 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. On May 5, 2017, the clerk entered default as to defendant12 . The Order to Show Cause dated April 20, 201710 is hereby DISCHARGED. Plaintiffs shall move for default judgment within 30 days of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Fri 05/05 6:07 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Klassic Enginerring and Construction, Inc. a California corporation (yl) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Thu 04/27 2:25 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Individual Retirement Account Defined Contribution Trust, Board of Trustees of the Eleven Counties Cement Masons Vacation Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Joint Apprenticeship Trust. (Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/20 11:09 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before May 4, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by defendant(s); Plaintiffs application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAIL. (clee) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 04/12 2:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Southern California Individual Retirement Account Defined Contribution Trust, Board of Trustees of the Eleven Counties Cement Masons Vacation Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Joint Apprenticeship Trust, upon Defendant Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Keivan Shirali - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 3:50 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:49 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Klassic Engineering and Construction, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PENSION TRUST; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVEN COUNTIES C, (Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 4:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PENSION TRUST; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVEN COUNTIES C. (Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 4:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by PLAINITFF BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PENSION TRUST; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVEN COUNTIES C. (Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19522431 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PENSION TRUST; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVEN COUNTIES C. (Attorney Nicholas Isaac Starkman added to party BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CEMENT MASONS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PENSION TRUST; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVEN COUNTIES C(pty:pla))(Starkman, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 |