Marine Fenders International, Inc. v. Actuant Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02075 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Actuant Asia, Pte. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Actuant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Marine Fenders International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 05/10 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Marine Fenders International, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Meyer, Nathan) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 12:23 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Actuant Corporation. (shb) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 12:22 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Actuant Asia, Pte. Ltd.. (shb) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 12:07 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marine Fenders International, Inc., (Meyer, Nathan) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 2:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Marine Fenders International, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 2:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Marine Fenders International, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 03/16 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 03/16 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 , Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 5:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF MARINE FENDERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Meyer, Nathan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 4:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF MARINE FENDERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Meyer, Nathan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 4:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MARINE FENDERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Meyer, Nathan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19522629 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff MARINE FENDERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attorney Nathan Meyer added to party MARINE FENDERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.(pty:pla))(Meyer, Nathan) |