Vickie Lynn Free v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02080 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
McKenna Motors Cerritos, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vickie Lynn Free
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 04/11 8:17 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:17-cv-01975 filed 4/10/2017. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Wed 04/05 3:34 PM
Conditional Transfer Order - CTO 91 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/21 10:10 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Staying Case by Judge David O. Carter: All proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigatin (the "MDL Panel") concerning the transfer of this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 03/20 9:57 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:15-cv-01930 DOC(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Manuel L. Real to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02080 DOC(SPx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 03/17 2:21 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition6 , filed by PLAINTIFF Vickie Lynn Free(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
6 | 6
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 03/17 10:50 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by PLAINTIFF Vickie Lynn Free(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 7:18 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants McKenna Motors Cerritos, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,, identifying Volkswagen AG. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/15 7:15 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants McKenna Motors Cerritos, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. Related Case(s): 02:15-cv-07367; 2:15-cv-07375; 2:15-cv-07390; 2:15-cv-07391; 2:15-cv-07395; 2:15-cv-07429; 2:15-cv-07430; 2:15-cv-07431; 2:15-cv-07432; 2:15-cv-07473; 2:15-cv-07474; 2:15-cv-07475; 2:15-cv-07477; 2:15-cv-07517; 2:15-cv-01930; 2:15-cv-01948; 2:15-cv-01525; 8:16-cv-00209; 2:16-cv-01143; 2:16-cv-1120; 2:16-cv-01119; 2:16-cv-01104; 2:16-cv-01205; 2:16-cv-01164; 2:16-cv-01507; 2:16-cv-01527; 2:16-cv-01539; 2:16-cv-01563; 2:16-cv-01573; 2:16-cv-01575; 2:16-cv-01576; 2:16-cv-01577; 2:16-cv-01578; 2:16-cv-01580; 2:16-cv-1661; 2:16-cv-1662; 2:16-cv-1663; 5:16-cv-00462; 2:16-cv-01970; 2:16-cv-02014; 2:16-cv-02046; 2:16-cv-02148; 2:16-cv-02210; 2:16-cv-02214; 2:16-cv-02301; 2:16-cv-02302; 2:16-cv-02420; 2:16-cv-02429; 2:16-cv-02438; 2:16-cv-02469; 2:16-cv-2637; 2:16-cv-2796; 2:16-cv-805; 2:16-cv-02892; 2:16-cv-03074; 2:16-cv-03161; 5:16-cv-933; 2:16-cv-03162; 2:16-cv-3163; 5:16-cv-934; 8:16-cv-894; 2:16-cv-3385; 2:16-cv-3537; 2:16-cv-3727; 5:16-cv-1100; 2:16-cv-03776; 2:16-cv-3985; 2:16-cv-04171; 5:16-cv-01238; 2:16-cv-04177; 2:16-cv-04178; 2:16-cv-04179; 2:16-cv-04180; 2:16-cv-04181; 2:16-cv-4242; 2:16-cv-4244; 2:16-cv-4246; 8:16-cv-01111; 2:16-cv-4331; 2:16-cv-04333; 2:16-cv-04336; 2:16-cv-04338; 2:16-cv-4382; 8:16-cv-1139; 2:16-cv-4386; 2:16-cv-4392; 2:16-cv-4393; 2:16-cv-4394; 2:16-cv-4395; 2:16-cv-4399; 2:16-cv-4400; 2:16-cv-4401; 2:16-cv-4402; 2:16-cv-4403; 2:16-cv-4404;2:16-cv-4405;2:16-cv-04406; 2:16-cv-4423; 2:16-cv-4514; 2:16-cv-4630; 5:16-cv-1406; 2:16-cv-4774; 5:16-cv-01468; 8:16-cv-01252; 2:16-cv-04963; 8:16-cv-01256; 5:16-cv-01475; 5:16-cv-01476; 5:16-cv-01480; 2:16-cv-04989; 8:16-cv-01259; 2:16-cv-04997; 5:16-cv-01485; 2:16-cv-05068; 8:16-cv-01292; 8:16-CV-01314; 2:16-cv-5355; 2:16-cv-05631; 5:16-cv-01649; 5:16-cv-01650; 2:16-cv-05669; 2:16-cv-05776; 2:16-cv-05868; 2:16-cv-05874; 5:16-cv-01706; 5:16-cv-01707; 5:16-cv-01708; 2:16-cv-05875; 2:16-cv-05876; 8:16-cv-01456; 5:16-cv-01709; 2:16-cv-05877; 8:16-cv-01457; 8:16-cv-01458; 2:16-cv-05879; 8:16-cv-01459; 2:16-cv-05880; 2:16-cv-05881; 2:16-cv-05882; 2:16-cv-058832:16-cv-05938; 2:16-cv-06023; 8:16-cv-01491; 5:16-cv-01732; 2:16-cv-6564; 5:16-cv-01865; 5:16-cv-01917; 2:16-cv-6831; 2:16-cv-6832; 2:16-cv-6838; 2:16-cv-6839; 2:16-cv-6899; 2:16-cv-6900; 2:16-cv-6909; 2:16-cv-6917; 2:16-cv-06947; 2:16-cv-07065; 5:16-cv-02013; 5:16-cv-02014; 5:16-cv-02017; 5:16-cv-02018; 2:16-cv-07152; 2:16-cv-07255; 2:16-cv-07270; 8:16-cv-01916; 2:16-cv-7799; 2:16-cv-7945; 2:16-cv-7951; 2:16-cv-7957; 2:16-cv-07972; 2:16-cv-7985; 2:16-cv-7990; 2:16-cv-8065; 2:16-cv-8173; 5:16-cv-02392; 2:16-cv-08635; 2:16-cv-08648; 2:16-cv-08988; 2:16-cv-9137; 2:16-cv-9154; 2:16-cv-9235; 5:16-CV-02566; 2:16-cv-9327; 2:16-cv-05355; 2:16-cv-09431; 2:16-cv-09444; 2:16-cv-09446; 2:17-cv-581; 5:17-cv-142; 5:17-CV-00144; 2:17-cv-00652; 2:17-cv-00701; 5:17-cv-00158; 2:17-cv-00704; 2:17-cv-00705; 2:17-cv-00769; 2:17-cv-00775; 2:17-cv-00905; 2:17-cv-00908; 2:17-cv-00928; 8:17-cv-00200; 5:17-cv-00213; 2:17-cv-01071; 5:17-cv-00250; 2:17-cv-01115; 2:17-cv-01119; 2:17-cv-01120; 2:17-cv-01180; 8:17-cv-00274; 2:17-cv-01315; 2:17-cv-01355; 2:17-cv-01356; 2:17-CV-01357; 2:17-cv-01358; 2:17-CV-01359; 5:17-CV-00313; 2:17-cv-01360; 2:17-cv-01447; 2:17-cv-01455; 5:17-cv-00360; 5:17-cv-00361; 8:17-cv-00331; 2:17-cv-01556; 8:17-cv-00365; 5:17-cv-00377; 8:17-cv-00366; 2:17-cv-01622; 8:17-cv-00374; 2:17-cv-01675; 2:17-CV-01676; 2:17-CV-01677; 2:17-cv-01767; 3:17-cv-1118; 2:17-cv-01832; 5:17-cv-430; 2:17-cv-1850; 2:17-cv-001948; 3:17-cv-01283; 5:17-cv-00451; 5:17-cv-00486 (Oswell, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 7:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants McKenna Motors Cerritos, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 7:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC650862 Receipt No: 0973-19523262 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants McKenna Motors Cerritos, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party McKenna Motors Cerritos, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., (pty:dft))(Oswell, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 3:54 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants McKenna Motors Cerritos, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Vickie Lynn Free. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/15/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et) |
||
trial
Jury Demand
Thu 03/16 3:57 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Vickie Lynn Free. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/15/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2](et) |