Juan Briseno v. 7 Eleven, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02082 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
7 Eleven, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Juan Briseno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 07/10 2:16 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On 6/5/2017, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, no later than 6/19/2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff failed to do so by that date. Accordingly, the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Notice of Judicial Move to Roybal Federal Building
Tue 06/06 4:47 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective June 1, 2017, Judge Standish is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 640 on the 6th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/05 3:37 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than June 19, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following on or before the above date as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Answer by the defendant or an application for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). See order for further details. (shb) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 06/02 4:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Juan Briseno, upon Defendant 7 Eleven, Inc. served on 5/11/2017, answer due 6/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraine Carter, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Au, Roland) |
|
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 06/02 12:47 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 7 Eleven, Inc. answer now due 6/1/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant 7 Eleven, Inc..(Attorney Ryan M McNamara added to party 7 Eleven, Inc.(pty:dft))(McNamara, Ryan) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 12:43 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant 7 Eleven, Inc. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 03/17 9:41 AM
NOTICE to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. PLAINTIFF is directed to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed with the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (cw) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 9:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JUAN BRISENO, (Au, Roland) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 9:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JUAN BRISENO. (Au, Roland) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 9:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff JUAN BRISENO. (Au, Roland) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19523371 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff JUAN BRISENO. (Attorney Roland Au added to party JUAN BRISENO(pty:pla))(Au, Roland) |