Edmond Chacon v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00486 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Moss Bros. German, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edmond Chacon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 04/11 8:18 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:17-cv-01973 filed 4/10/2017. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Wed 04/05 3:44 PM
Conditional Transfer Order - CTO 91 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/21 10:07 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Staying Case by Judge David O. Carter: All proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "MDL Panel") concerning the transfer of this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 03/20 4:11 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:15-cv-01930-DOC-SPx. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:17-cv-00486-DOC-SPx. Signed by Judge David O. Carter (aco) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 03/17 10:24 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by PLAINTIFF Edmond Chacon(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Moss Bros. German, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,, identifying Volkswagen AG. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/15 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Moss Bros. German, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. Related Case(s): 02:15-cv-07367; 2:15-cv-07375; 2:15-cv-07390; 2:15-cv-07391; 2:15-cv-07395; 2:15-cv-07429; 2:15-cv-07430; 2:15-cv-07431; 2:15-cv-07432; 2:15-cv-07473; 2:15-cv-07474; 2:15-cv-07475; 2:15-cv-07477; 2:15-cv-07517; 2:15-cv-01930; 2:15-cv-01948; 2:15-cv-01525; 8:16-cv-00209; 2:16-cv-01143; 2:16-cv-1120; 2:16-cv-01119; 2:16-cv-01104; 2:16-cv-01205; 2:16-cv-01164; 2:16-cv-01507; 2:16-cv-01527; 2:16-cv-01539; 2:16-cv-01563; 2:16-cv-01573; 2:16-cv-01575; 2:16-cv-01576; 2:16-cv-01577; 2:16-cv-01578; 2:16-cv-01580; 2:16-cv-1661; 2:16-cv-1662; 2:16-cv-1663; 5:16-cv-00462; 2:16-cv-01970; 2:16-cv-02014; 2:16-cv-02046; 2:16-cv-02148; 2:16-cv-02210; 2:16-cv-02214; 2:16-cv-02301; 2:16-cv-02302; 2:16-cv-02420; 2:16-cv-02429; 2:16-cv-02438; 2:16-cv-02469; 2:16-cv-2637; 2:16-cv-2796; 2:16-cv-805; 2:16-cv-02892; 2:16-cv-03074; 2:16-cv-03161; 5:16-cv-933; 2:16-cv-03162; 2:16-cv-3163; 5:16-cv-934; 8:16-cv-894; 2:16-cv-3385; 2:16-cv-3537; 2:16-cv-3727; 5:16-cv-1100; 2:16-cv-03776; 2:16-cv-3985; 2:16-cv-04171; 5:16-cv-01238; 2:16-cv-04177; 2:16-cv-04178; 2:16-cv-04179; 2:16-cv-04180; 2:16-cv-04181; 2:16-cv-4242; 2:16-cv-4244; 2:16-cv-4246; 8:16-cv-01111; 2:16-cv-4331; 2:16-cv-04333; 2:16-cv-04336; 2:16-cv-04338; 2:16-cv-4382; 8:16-cv-1139; 2:16-cv-4386; 2:16-cv-4392; 2:16-cv-4393; 2:16-cv-4394; 2:16-cv-4395; 2:16-cv-4399; 2:16-cv-4400; 2:16-cv-4401; 2:16-cv-4402; 2:16-cv-4403; 2:16-cv-4404;2:16-cv-4405;2:16-cv-04406; 2:16-cv-4423; 2:16-cv-4514; 2:16-cv-4630; 5:16-cv-1406; 2:16-cv-4774; 5:16-cv-01468; 8:16-cv-01252; 2:16-cv-04963; 8:16-cv-01256; 5:16-cv-01475; 5:16-cv-01476; 5:16-cv-01480; 2:16-cv-04989; 8:16-cv-01259; 2:16-cv-04997; 5:16-cv-01485; 2:16-cv-05068; 8:16-cv-01292; 8:16-CV-01314; 2:16-cv-5355; 2:16-cv-05631; 5:16-cv-01649; 5:16-cv-01650; 2:16-cv-05669; 2:16-cv-05776; 2:16-cv-05868; 2:16-cv-05874; 5:16-cv-01706; 5:16-cv-01707; 5:16-cv-01708; 2:16-cv-05875; 2:16-cv-05876; 8:16-cv-01456; 5:16-cv-01709; 2:16-cv-05877; 8:16-cv-01457; 8:16-cv-01458; 2:16-cv-05879; 8:16-cv-01459; 2:16-cv-05880; 2:16-cv-05881; 2:16-cv-05882; 2:16-cv-058832:16-cv-05938; 2:16-cv-06023; 8:16-cv-01491; 5:16-cv-01732; 2:16-cv-6564; 5:16-cv-01865; 5:16-cv-01917; 2:16-cv-6831; 2:16-cv-6832; 2:16-cv-6838; 2:16-cv-6839; 2:16-cv-6899; 2:16-cv-6900; 2:16-cv-6909; 2:16-cv-6917; 2:16-cv-06947; 2:16-cv-07065; 5:16-cv-02013; 5:16-cv-02014; 5:16-cv-02017; 5:16-cv-02018; 2:16-cv-07152; 2:16-cv-07255; 2:16-cv-07270; 8:16-cv-01916; 2:16-cv-7799; 2:16-cv-7945; 2:16-cv-7951; 2:16-cv-7957; 2:16-cv-07972; 2:16-cv-7985; 2:16-cv-7990; 2:16-cv-8065; 2:16-cv-8173; 5:16-cv-02392; 2:16-cv-08635; 2:16-cv-08648; 2:16-cv-08988; 2:16-cv-9137; 2:16-cv-9154; 2:16-cv-9235; 5:16-CV-02566; 2:16-cv-9327; 2:16-cv-05355; 2:16-cv-09431; 2:16-cv-09444; 2:16-cv-09446; 2:17-cv-581; 5:17-cv-142; 5:17-CV-00144; 2:17-cv-00652; 2:17-cv-00701; 5:17-cv-00158; 2:17-cv-00704; 2:17-cv-00705; 2:17-cv-00769; 2:17-cv-00775; 2:17-cv-00905; 2:17-cv-00908; 2:17-cv-00928; 8:17-cv-00200; 5:17-cv-00213; 2:17-cv-01071; 5:17-cv-00250; 2:17-cv-01115; 2:17-cv-01119; 2:17-cv-01120; 2:17-cv-01180; 8:17-cv-00274; 2:17-cv-01315; 2:17-cv-01355; 2:17-cv-01356; 2:17-CV-01357; 2:17-cv-01358; 2:17-CV-01359; 5:17-CV-00313; 2:17-cv-01360; 2:17-cv-01447; 2:17-cv-01455; 5:17-cv-00360; 5:17-cv-00361; 8:17-cv-00331; 2:17-cv-01556; 8:17-cv-00365; 5:17-cv-00377; 8:17-cv-00366; 2:17-cv-01622; 8:17-cv-00374; 2:17-cv-01675; 2:17-CV-01676; 2:17-CV-01677; 2:17-cv-01767; 3:17-cv-1118; 2:17-cv-01832; 5:17-cv-430; 2:17-cv-1850; 2:17-cv-001948; 3:17-cv-01283; 5:17-cv-00451 (Oswell, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 4:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Moss Bros. German, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number RIC 1702625 Receipt No: 0973-19522365 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Moss Bros. German, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party Moss Bros. German, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., (pty:dft))(Oswell, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 4:08 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Moss Bros. German, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Edmond Chacon. Filed in State Court on 2/15/17 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/16 4:49 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Edmond Chacon, upon Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 2/16/2017, answer due 3/9/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal (car) |