Gregory Richardson v. IVAMS, Inc., et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00487 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
the Hon. Christopher B Harmon
|
|
Defendant
Tracy Zhang
|
|
Defendant
Brian Thorne
|
|
Defendant
the Hon. Ottolia
|
|
Defendant
Dale McClain
|
|
Defendant
IVAMS, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Howington
|
|
Defendant
the Hon. Harold W Hopp
|
|
Defendant
Haslam, Perri and Thorne, LLP
|
|
Defendant
Donald Haslam
|
|
Defendant
First Centennial Mortgage Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Peter Eggertsen
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
the Hon. Steven Counselis
|
|
Defendant
Hon. Judge David Cohn
|
|
Defendant
Martha Bellinger
|
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
69 | 69
order
Reopen Case
Mon 03/04 2:42 PM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Reopen Case66 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiff Gregory Richardson ("Richardson") moves to reopen this matter. (Mot., Dkt. No. 66.) The motion is unopposed. For the following reasons, the Court DENIES Richardson's motion. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter and VACATES the March 11, 2024, hearing. Fed R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15.Denying66 MOTION to Reopen Case. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es) |