Debra Blackmore et al v. John McMahon et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00490 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
County of San Bernardino
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John McMahon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Debra Blackmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwayne Blackmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwight Blackmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Cardosa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 08/23 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, John McMahon. Dismissal is WITH. (Thebeau, James) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Fri 06/30 12:43 PM
[IN CHAMBERS] Text Only Entry: Order to Show Cause issued 6/14/17 is ordered DISCHARGED. Plaintiff is advised that it is the plaintiff's responsibility to move this case forward. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) |
|
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 06/30 12:41 PM
ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (lb) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/30 8:23 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, John McMahon.(Attorney James H Thebeau added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft), Attorney James H Thebeau added to party John McMahon(pty:dft))(Thebeau, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Wed 06/21 12:48 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),9 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dv) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 06/14 12:25 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Cardosa, Debra Blackmore, Dwight Blackmore, Dwayne Blackmore, upon Defendant County of San Bernardino served on 6/14/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Terrell, James) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 06/14 12:23 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Cardosa, Debra Blackmore, Dwight Blackmore, Dwayne Blackmore, upon Defendant John McMahon served on 6/14/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Terrell, James) |
|
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Wed 06/14 11:29 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The Court on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than June 28, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Alternatively, it will be a sufficient response to this OSC to file on or before that date one of the following: (see document for details). (dro) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 12:14 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants County of San Bernardino, John McMahon. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 12:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 11:29 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs Debra Blackmore, Dwayne Blackmore, Dwight Blackmore, Antonio Cardosa. (Terrell, James) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 11:28 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Terrell, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 11:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Debra Blackmore, Dwayne Blackmore, Dwight Blackmore, Antonio Cardosa. (Terrell, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 11:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19523420 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Cardosa, Debra Blackmore, Dwight Blackmore, Dwayne Blackmore. (Attorney James Stephen Terrell added to party Debra Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney James Stephen Terrell added to party Dwayne Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney James Stephen Terrell added to party Dwight Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney James Stephen Terrell added to party Antonio Cardosa(pty:pla))(Terrell, James) |