Edco Plastics, Inc. v. E-Z Lettering Service et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00456 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:36 AM PDT |
Cross Claimant
E-Z Lettering Service
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Euroma International, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
E-Z Lettering Service
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edco Plastics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Euroma International, Inc.
Terminated: 06/29/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 08/24 2:18 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (dro) |
|
41 | 41
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/24 2:15 PM
ORDER Dismissing Entire Action by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Pursuant to stipulation40 signed by the parties hereto, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS the following: (see document for details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 08/23 1:15 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Parties have Settled filed by Defendant and Cross-Claimant E-Z Lettering Service.(Newmeyer, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Dismissing Entire Action | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 07/31 8:58 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 12, 2017. (mku) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/11 4:21 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Crossclaim31 as to cross defendant Euroma International, Inc.. (twdb) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/11 4:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request36 , Summons Request35 , Summons Request32 , Crossclaim31 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,33 filed by Cross-Claimant E-Z Lettering Service. (King, Jonathan) (Main Document 37 replaced on 7/11/2017) (twdb) |
|
36 | 36
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/11 12:48 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request35 , Summons Request32 , Crossclaim31 filed by Cross-Claimant E-Z Lettering Service. (King, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/10 11:24 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request32 , Crossclaim31 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,33 filed by Cross-Claimant E-Z Lettering Service. (King, Jonathan) |
|
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 07/10 10:49 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On July 3, the Court issued an Order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution25 . On July 7, 2017, Defendant E-Z Lettering Service filed an Answer29 . In light of this responsive filing, the Court hereby orders the OSC discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Mon 07/10 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request32 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Crossclaim filed 7/7/17, however the summons is as to a third party complaint. There is no third party complaint on file with the court. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Summons Request
Fri 07/07 2:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Crossclaim31 filed by Defendant/Cross-Claimant E-Z Lettering Service. (King, Jonathan) |
|
31 | 31
cmp
Crossclaim
Fri 07/07 2:06 PM
CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Euroma International, Inc.; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant/Cross-Claimant E-Z Lettering Service.(King, Jonathan) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 07/07 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Cross-Claimant E-Z Lettering Service, identifying EDCO Plastics, Inc.; E-Z Lettering Service, dba E-Z Line; Euroma International, Inc.. (King, Jonathan) |
|
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 07/07 1:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants E-Z Lettering Service.(Attorney Jonathan N King added to party E-Z Lettering Service(pty:dft))(King, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Wed 07/05 4:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney,on Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),27 . THE COURT HEREBY GRANTS this last extension of time to E-Z Lettering Service dba E-Z Line to respond to the Complaint to July 7, 2017. (twdb) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 07/03 2:19 PM
Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to E-Z Lettering Service answer now due 7/7/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc..(Flyer, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
misc
Response
Mon 07/03 2:10 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,25 Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution (Flyer, David) |
|
25 | 25
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 07/03 8:07 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Re Dismisal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiffs counsel, to show cause in writing no later than July 3, 2047, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See document for further information. (lwag) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 06/29 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Euroma International, Inc.. (Flyer, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Withdraw as Attorney Substitute Attorney
Tue 06/20 10:34 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark D Nielsen terminated; granting19 Request to Substitute Attorney. See document for further information. (dv) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Fri 06/16 10:21 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, granting Stipulation Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading20 . NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. THE COURT HEREBY GRANTS the parties' stipulation extending the time to June 30, 2017, for defendant E-Z Lettering Service dba E-Z Line to file its responsive pleading to the complaint of plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc. **Any further requests for a continuance are strongly disfavored. ** (dro) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 06/16 10:15 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, GRANTING Stipulation Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading.18 Defendant Euroma International, Inc. (Euroma) shall file its responsive pleading no later than June 30, 2017. (es) Modified on 6/16/2017 (dro) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 06/14 9:06 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to E-Z Lettering Service answer now due 6/30/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant E-Z Lettering Service.(Newmeyer, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Tue 06/13 3:55 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Thomas F. Newmeyer in place of attorney Mark D. Nielsen and Daniel M. Cislo filed by Defendant E-Z Lettering Service. (Attorney Thomas Frederick Newmeyer added to party E-Z Lettering Service(pty:dft)) (Newmeyer, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 06/12 6:23 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 6/30/2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant EUROMA INTERNATIONAL, INC. Euroma International, Inc..(Martinez, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 06/05 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Cislo & Thomas LLP (Mark D. Nielsen and Daniel M. Cislo) to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) filed by Defendant E-Z Lettering Service. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Nielsen, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark D. Nielsen in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 05/30 9:51 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Euroma International, Inc. answer now due 6/14/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Euroma International, Inc..(Martinez, David) |
|
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Tue 05/30 8:07 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 14, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant E-Z Lettering Service.(Nielsen, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 05/16 3:06 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to E-Z Lettering Service answer now due 5/30/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant E-Z Lettering Service.(Attorney Mark D Nielsen added to party E-Z Lettering Service(pty:dft))(Nielsen, Mark) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/15 4:48 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Euroma International, Inc. identifying Defendant EUROMA INTERNATIONAL, INC. as Corporate Parent. (Martinez, David) |
|
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 05/15 4:44 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Euroma International, Inc. answer now due 5/30/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant EUROMA INTERNATIONAL, INC. Euroma International, Inc..(Attorney David Martinez added to party Euroma International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martinez, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/18 9:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc.. upon E-Z Lettering Service waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/16/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Mark D. Nielsen. (Flyer, David) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/18 9:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc.. upon Euroma International, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/16/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Mark D. Nielsen. (Flyer, David) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 9:36 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc., (Flyer, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 03/15 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 5:36 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants E-Z Lettering Service, Euroma International, Inc. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 5:34 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 03/15 11:08 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Edco Plastics, Inc.. (Flyer, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 10:57 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc.. (Flyer, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 10:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc.. (Flyer, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19517507 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Edco Plastics, Inc.. (Attorney David R Flyer added to party Edco Plastics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Flyer, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Patent 6,962,013 B1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Accused Product |