Luvvitt LLC v. Rearth USA, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00464 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rearth USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Luvvitt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Mon 07/29 3:08 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1 Order of Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/06 10:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Joint Stipulation for Dismissal18 . The Court, having considered the Parties Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, and for good cause having been shown IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC's claims asserted against Defendant Rearth USA, LLC dba Ringke are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. (dro) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 12/05 11:18 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC.(Cotman, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 07/24 2:26 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Dismissing Action on Notice of Settlement by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been settled by a Notice of Settlement16 , here by orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for sixty (60) days to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed. This order shall not prejudice any party in this action (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Settlement
Mon 07/24 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC and Defendant Rearth USA, LLC dba Ringke and Request to Designate the Case Inactive filed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC. (Cotman, Daniel) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 06/16 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on September 8, 2017. (mku) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 05/17 10:50 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel C Cotman counsel for Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC. Rasheed M. McWilliams is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC. (Cotman, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/09 12:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendant Rearth USA, LLC dba Ringkes Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Rearth USA, LLC (Anderson, Allan) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/09 11:58 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Defendant Rearth USA, LLC dba Ringkes Answer To Complaint filed by Defendant Rearth USA, LLC.(Anderson, Allan) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Fri 04/14 1:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint10 . The Court has considered the Parties' stipulation extending the deadline for Defendant Rearth USA, LLC, dba Ringke ("Rearth") to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint from March 27, 2017 to April 17, 2017, and for good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Rearth's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due by May 17, 2017. (dro) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 04/12 2:38 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rearth USA, LLC answer now due 5/17/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Rearth USA, LLC.(Attorney Allan E Anderson added to party Rearth USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Anderson, Allan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 04/05 2:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC, upon Defendant Rearth USA, LLC served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chung, individual who is authorized to receive service on behalf of Defendant Rearth USA, LLC dba Ringke in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McWilliams, Rasheed) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:04 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Rearth USA, LLC. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 10:40 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 03/15 4:47 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Luvvitt LLC. (McWilliams, Rasheed) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC, (McWilliams, Rasheed) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 4:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC. (McWilliams, Rasheed) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 4:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC. (McWilliams, Rasheed) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19522452 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Luvvitt LLC. (Attorney Rasheed McWilliams added to party Luvvitt LLC(pty:pla))(McWilliams, Rasheed) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-G |