Jose Trujillo v. Smart & Final Stores LLC et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Referred: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00379 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
RHC Associates
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Smart & Final Stores LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 02/22 10:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On February 21, 2018, Plaintiff filed a Stipulation re Dismissal of Entire Action (Doc.25) under Rule 41. In light of Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/22/2018. (Herman, H) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/21 3:22 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of entire action by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/07 3:55 PM
ANSWER by RHC Associates, Smart & Final Stores LLC.(Freedman, David) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/23 3:25 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jose Trujillo.(Best, Zachary) |
|
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 10/23 2:55 PM
STIPULATION Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint; ORDER - that Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint, a copy of which was filed with the Parties' stipulation, within five (5) calendar days of the date this Order is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint shall be filed within 21 days after the First Amended Complaint is filed. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/23/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 10/19 10:51 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for leave to file First Amended Complaint by Jose Trujillo.(Best, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/25 11:25 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Amendment to Pleadings: October 20, 2017. Initial Disclosure: September 29, 2017. Expert Disclosure: March 9, 2018. Supplemental Expert Disclosure: March 23, 2018. Non-expert Discovery Cutoff: February 23, 2018. Expert Discovery Cutoff: May 11, 2018. Pretrial Motion Filing Deadline: August 3, 2018. Settlement Conf.: Not set . PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 10/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. JURY TRIAL (3-4 days) set for 1/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Consent Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/22 11:26 AM
CONSENT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/22/17. The New Case No. is: 1:17-cv-0379-BAM. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 09/21 8:43 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by RHC Associates, Smart & Final Stores LLC. (Freedman, David) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 09/20 11:27 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
16 | 16
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 09/20 10:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On September 20, 2017, the Court held an initial scheduling conference and provided case management dates to the parties. At the conference, the Court confirmed the parties' willingness to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28. U.S.C. Sec. 636(c)(1). Before a Scheduling Order may issue, the Court first must receive from each party a notice of consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge. The parties are ordered, to file their consent forms no later than September 27, 2017 . See (Doc. 3, Attach. 2). The Court will issue the Scheduling Order as soon as each party has filed a notice of consent. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 09/20 10:17 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/2017: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held. Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Zachary Best appeared by telephone, present. Defendants Counsel David Freedman appeared by telephone, present. Court Reporter/CD Number: in chambers. (Herman, H) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 08/18 10:55 AM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by David G. Freedman. (Freedman, David) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/03 11:35 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/3/2017: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOT HELD - The parties expressed a desire to work towards a settlement before scheduling discovery and trial dates. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE to 9/20/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . If the parties file a notice of settlement prior to the scheduling conference, the conference will be vacated. Plaintiff's Counsel Tanya Moore - Telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel David Freedman - Telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Off the record. (Valdez, E) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Scheduling Report
Tue 07/25 2:42 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 10:35 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by RHC Associates. Attorney Freedman, David G. added.(Freedman, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 06/06 11:06 AM
STIPULATION for Further Continuance of Mandatory Scheduling Conference; ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference is continued from 6/14/2017 to Thursday, August 3, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. , in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/6/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 06/02 4:01 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuance of mandatory scheduling conference re3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/02 10:00 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: RHC Associates served on 5/23/2017, answer due 6/13/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minute Order
Fri 05/26 4:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties wishing to appear telephonically for Scheduling Conference Hearing on June 14, 2017 at 09:00AM, may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866 . signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/26/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement
Mon 04/10 2:06 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Defendant Smart & Final Stores LLC. (Freedman, David) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/10 1:49 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Smart & Final Stores LLC. Attorney Freedman, David G. added.(Freedman, David) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/24 2:48 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Smart & Final Stores LLC served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for DAD
Wed 03/15 11:39 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Wed 03/15 11:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *RHC Associates, Smart & Final Stores LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary M. Best* *Mission Law Firm, A.P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT against All Defendants by Jose Trujillo. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6961850)(Best, Zachary) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |