Trujillo v. Romine Group, LLC et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony W Ishii |
Referred: | Sheila K Oberto |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00383 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Romine Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bhan Singh
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 08/18 8:24 AM
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/17/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/16 8:47 AM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of Entire Action by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/11 8:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement indicating that settlement has been reached,10 . The Court grants the parties' request to file their dismissal documents by no later than September 11, 2017, and ORDERS the parties, no later than September 11, 2017, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. See Local Rule 160 and Local Rule 272. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/11/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 08/10 4:56 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT of Entire Action by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 06/14 2:24 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER For CONTINUANCE of Mandatory Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently 6/22/2017, is CONTINUED to 8/17/2017, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 8/10/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/14/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 06/13 10:45 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuance of mandatory scheduling conference re3 Civil New Case Documents for AWI by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/12 12:41 AM
ANSWER by Romine Group, LLC.(Owdom, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/20 1:52 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Romine Group, LLC served on 4/13/2017, answer due 5/4/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/18 2:27 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by Romine Group, LLC. Attorney Owdom, Matthew Davis added. (Owdom, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/27 3:34 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Bhan Singh served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for AWI
Wed 03/15 2:05 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Wed 03/15 2:04 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Romine Group, LLC, Bhan Singh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Best* *Mission Law Firm, P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT (ADA) against All Defendants by Jose Trujillo. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6963211)(Best, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |