|
GPO
May 16 2017
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/16/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/11/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 12/1/2017; Expert 4/13/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/27/2018; Hearing by 5/25/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/15/2018; Hearing by 7/31/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 11/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
|
|
GPO
Dec 14 2018
ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2018. (Hall, S)
|
|
GPO
Jan 10 2019
STIPULATION and ORDER 53 Continuing the Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2019. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 2/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Trial submissions due by 1/25/2019. Exhibit binders due by 2/8/2019. Defendant's expert witness will be permitted to testify via teleconference or videoconference, if necessary. (Hall, S)
|
|
GPO
Jan 18 2019
ORDER on Motion to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Dr. Price, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/2019. (Hall, S)
|
|
GPO
Feb 01 2019
ORDER re COURTROOM/TRIAL DECORUM, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/1/2019. (Hall, S)
|
|
GPO
Feb 11 2019
der signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/11/2019. (Timken, A)ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The parties report they had come to terms of settlement. (Doc. 81) They indicate they will seek dismissal of the action soon. Id. at 2. Thus, the Court ORDERS: 1. The stipulation to dismiss the action SHALL be filed no later than March 8, 2019; 2. All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. The parties are advised that failure to comply with this order may result in the Court imposing sanctions, including the dismissal of the action. Or
|
|
GPO
Mar 05 2019
ORDER CLOSING the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/5/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
|