|
GPO
Oct 02 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/30/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING 1 Petition with leave to amend. Petitioner to file amended petition within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
|
|
GPO
Dec 04 2018
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/4/18 DIRECTING plaintiff to reserve 23 Motion to Dismiss on petitioner at his current address. Petitioner shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition within thirty days of the date of service of 23 Motion to Dismiss. (Coll, A)
|
|
GPO
Jan 30 2019
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/29/2019 DENYING petitioner's 48, 53 motions to appoint counsel and GRANTING respondent's 23 motion to dismiss because the court does not have jurisdiction to entertain the petition. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and the court DECLINES to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
|
|
GPO
Apr 27 2021
e to future filings. Any further motions should be directed to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Plummer, M)ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/26/21 TERMINATING 73 Motion. As this case is closed and the court lacks jurisdiction, documents filed by petitioner since the closing date will be disregarded and no orders will issue in respons
|