Tayeb v NWN Corporation, et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Troy L Nunley |
Referred: | Gregory G Hollows |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00553 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Department of Technology
|
|
Defendant
NWN Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State of California
|
|
Plaintiff
Athar Tayeb
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 09/25 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/25/2017: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.18 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Mon 09/25 9:19 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Athar Tayeb. (Welch, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Thu 07/06 12:14 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/6/2017 STAYING the Court's ruling on the parties' supplemental briefing re federal jurisdiction pending the completion of mediation in this matter; CAUTIONING all parties that this stay will expire in the event any party fails to attend and/or participate in mediation in good faith, or two weeks after mediation is complete, but no later than 8/29/2017. (Michel, G.) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Response
Wed 07/05 11:42 PM
RESPONSE by Athar Tayeb to14 Response. (Welch, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/05 4:28 PM
STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE COURTS RULING ON THE PARTIES SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON THE BASIS FOR JURISDICTION PENDING OUTCOME OF MEDIATION by NWN Corporation.(Harris Chiang, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Response
Tue 06/27 6:04 PM
RESPONSE by NWN Corporation to 13 Minute Order,,,.(Harris Chiang, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BARBARA L. HARRIS CHIANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NWN CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S JUNE 13, 2017 MINUTE ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING FEDERAL SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF BEN TURNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NWN CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S JUNE 13, 2017 MINUTE ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING FEDERAL SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, | ||
Att: 3 Response REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NWN CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S JUNE 13, 2017 MINUTE ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING FEDERAL SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minute Order
Tue 06/13 4:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Judicial Assistant, D. Morrison for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/13/2017: Pursuant to the Joint Status Report submitted by the parties on 05/12/2017, (ECF No.12 ), the Court hereby orders the parties to file supplemental briefing with this Court addressing the basis for federal jurisdiction. The JSR indicated that Plaintiff is uncertain that this Court in fact has subject matter jurisdiction over the matter, and the Court finds that it would be imprudent to continue scheduling this matter without first determining whether subject matter indeed exists. As such, Defendant shall file a supplemental brief not exceeding ten (10) pages addressing this issue with the Court within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. Plaintiff is then afforded seven (7) days to file a response to Defendant's brief not to exceed ten (10) pages. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Morrison, D) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Fri 05/12 3:05 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by NWN Corporation.(Harris Chiang, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service of Joint Status Report | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/14 12:42 PM
ANSWER by NWN Corporation.(Harris Chiang, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/14 12:12 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Emily A. Mertes on behalf of NWN Corporation. Attorney Mertes, Emily A. added.(Mertes, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order
Fri 04/07 9:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/7/2017: Upon further review of the record in this case and the Advisory Committee Notes for Rule 15, the Court deems the First Amended Complaint properly filed and it is hereby UNSTRICKEN. The First Amended Complaint (ECF No.7 ) is deemed properly filed on 3/31/2017. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minute Order
Mon 04/03 1:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/3/2017: Plaintiff has filed a First Amended Complaint (ECF No.7 ) without leave of court. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), a party is permitted to file an amended complaint within 21 days of a pleading as of right unless a response to the pleading has already been filed. Once a responsive pleading has been filed the party must seek leave of court. Here, Defendant NWN Corporation has already answered the Complaint, and Plaintiff must seek leave of this Court before filing an amended complaint. Accordingly, the First Amended Complaint (ECF No.7 ) is hereby STRICKEN. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/31 8:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Athar Tayeb.(Welch, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/17 9:50 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by NWN Corporation.(Harris Chiang, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/16 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by NWN Corporation re4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Harris Chiang, Barbara) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil New Case Documents for TLN
Wed 03/15 8:20 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by NWN Corporation .(Harris Chiang, Barbara) Modified on 3/15/2017 (Kaminski, H). | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2017 00207425 by NWN Corporation .(Harris Chiang, Barbara) Modified on 3/15/2017 (Kaminski, H). | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by NWN Corporation(Harris Chiang, Barbara) Modified on 3/15/2017 (Kaminski, H). | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
RECEIPT number 0972-6961811 for $400.00 for filing fee from Harris Chiang, Barbara L.. (Kaminski, H) |