Titus v. Martin-Brower Company, LLC
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Mendez |
Referred: | Gregory G Hollows |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00558 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 05:704 Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Martin-Brower Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Titus
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/04 11:13 AM
DECLARATION of Christopher Longely on Settlement Distribution re26 Order. (Ackermann, Craig) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/14 8:49 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/13/2019 APPROVING St. Christopher Truckers Development and Relief Fund as the cy pres beneficiary, and MODIFIES24 Final Approval Order as follows: the Settlement Administrator, Atticus Administration, LLC, shall send all funds associated with settlement checks that have not been cashed after the check cashing deadline to St. Christopher Truckers Development and Relief Fund. (Huang, H) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 02/12 4:53 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Directing Uncashed Settlement Checks to cy pres Beneficiary by Justin Titus.(Ackermann, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Approving Proposed Cy Pres Beneficiary | ||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
6
pgs
order
Order Judgment
Wed 06/20 3:52 PM
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/19/18. (Becknal, R) |
|
23 | 23
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Judgment
Tue 06/19 1:59 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 6/19/2018 ; Motions terminated:20 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and Enhancement Award filed by Justin Titus,21 Motion for order filed by Justin Titus ; granting20 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting21 Motion for Judgment. After hearing, the Court signed the proposed orders. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Ackerman; R. Wasserman present. Defendants Counsel D. Jacobson present. Court Reporter: K. Barajas. (Vine, H) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Statement of Non-Opposition
Tue 06/05 1:32 PM
STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Martin-Brower Company, LLC to21 Motion for order. (Jacobson, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Judgment
Tue 05/29 12:44 PM
MOTION for JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Justin Titus. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Ackermann, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF CRAIG J. ACKERMANN, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration OF ROBERT WASSERMAN, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration ON NOTICE AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION, | ||
Att: 4 6 pgs Proposed Order ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT | ||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 05/03 2:44 PM
MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES , COSTS, and ENHANCEMENT AWARD; and NOTICE OF MOTION by Justin Titus. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Ackermann, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Enhancement Award, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Enhancement Award, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Enhancement Award, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Enhancement Award, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Robert Wasserman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Enhancement Award, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert Wasserman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Enhancement Award | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 02/28 2:16 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/27/2018 GRANTING16 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. A Final Approval hearing on the question of whether the proposed Settlement, attorneys' fees to Class Counsel, and the Class Representative's Enhancement Payment should be finally approved as fair, reasonable and adequate as to the members of the Class is SCHEDULED for 6/19/2018, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez.. (York, M) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/27 2:58 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 2/27/2018 ; Final settlement Hearing set for 6/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.); granting16 Motion. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Ackermann; R. Wasserman present. Defendants Counsel D. Jacobson present. Court Reporter: K. Barajas. (Vine, H) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Statement of Non-Opposition
Tue 02/06 4:39 PM
STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Martin-Brower Company, LLC to16 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Jacobson, David) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 12/14 10:01 AM
MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Justin Titus. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Wasserman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Declaration of Robert J. Wasserman, | ||
Att: 3 62 pgs Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann, | ||
Att: 4 41 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Wed 11/15 3:44 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Martin-Brower Company, LLC. (Furuta, Reiko) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 11/09 3:09 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Martin-Brower Company, LLC. (Furuta, Reiko) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 10:27 AM
ANSWER by Martin-Brower Company, LLC.(Furuta, Reiko) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/22 3:53 PM
FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Martin-Brower Company, LLC by Justin Titus.(Becknal, R) |
|
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 05/22 3:48 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/17 ORDERING Plaintiff Justin Titus and the Putative Class shall have leave to file the attached Amended Class Action Complaint in the above-captioned matter; Plaintiff Justin Titus and the Putative Class shall have 10 days from the date of entry of this Order to serve the Amended Class Action Complaint upon defendant the Martin-Brower Company, LLC.; and Defendant The Martin-Brower Company, LLC shall have 21 days from the date of service of the Amended Class Action Complaint to respond to it.(Becknal, R) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 05/22 8:04 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint by Justin Titus.(Wasserman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order
Fri 05/19 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER: re8 Status Report - In view of the parties scheduled October 17, 2017 mediation, the Court orders that within 30 days of the completion of the mediation, the parties are to file an updated joint status report. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Fri 05/19 7:55 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Justin Titus. (Wasserman, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement
Mon 04/24 6:01 PM
STATEMENT of Disclosure by Defendant The Martin-Brower Company, LLC.(Furuta, Reiko) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/24 5:53 PM
ANSWER by The Martin-Brower Company, LLC. Attorney Furuta, Reiko Linda added.(Furuta, Reiko) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/04 4:37 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading by The Martin-Brower Company, LLC. Attorney Jacobson, David D. added. (Jacobson, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/21 8:33 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: The Martin-Brower Company, LLC served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Wasserman, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for JAM
Wed 03/15 1:47 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Wed 03/15 1:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *The Martin-Brower Company, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney * Robert Joshua Wasserman* *Mayall Hurley, P.C.* *2453 Grand Canal Blvd.* *Stockton, CA 95207*. (Kaminski, H) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT against The Martin-Brower Company, LLC by Justin Titus. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6963479)(Wasserman, Robert) Modified on 3/15/2017 (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |