Morris v. Trans Union, LLC
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger T Benitez |
Referred: | Andrew G Schopler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00511 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florence Morris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago |
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 09/28 10:31 AM
ORDER Granting19 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/27/2017. (knb) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/20 5:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Trans Union, LLC. (Frontino, Brian) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 08/31 2:19 PM
MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): Parties provided an oral status report to chambers regarding settlement on 8/31/2017. The parties shall jointly call Judge Schopler's chambers on 9/21/2017, at 2:00 p.m. to provide a further oral status report as to the progress of filing a stipulation to dismiss. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating that joint call to chambers. Should the stipulation to dismiss be filed before that time, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court order. (no document attached) (jrg) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 08/17 2:00 PM
ORDER (AGS): The parties have provided the oral status report to chambers. The motion to continue (ECF No. 16) is granted. The parties shall jointly call Judge Schopler's chambers on August 31, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. to provide a further oral status report as to the progress of filing a stipulation to dismiss. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating that joint call to chambers. Should the stipulation to dismiss be filed before that time, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 08/17/2017.(no document attached) (mxa) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Continue
Wed 08/16 7:52 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference by Florence Morris.(Ibey, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 06/26 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Florence Morris(Kazerounian, Abbas) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
14 | 14
minutes
~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 06/26 1:48 PM
MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): Based on the parties' oral representation the parties have settled, the Court vacates the June 27, 2017 ENE and CMC. The parties shall jointly call Judge Schopler's chambers on August 17, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. to provide an oral status report as to the progress of filing a stipulation to dismiss. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating that joint call to chambers. Should the stipulation to dismiss be filed before that time, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court order. (no document attached) (ela) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Joint Discovery Plan
Tue 06/20 3:18 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Florence Morris(Kazerounian, Abbas) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 06/14 10:17 AM
ORDER (AGS): Defendant's motion for leave to appear by telephone [ECF No. 11] at the upcoming ENE and CMC is granted. Defendant's representative must be available to participate by telephone throughout the proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/14/2017. (no document attached) (mxa) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear
Mon 06/12 3:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Trans Union, LLC. (Frontino, Brian) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Mon 05/15 1:50 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are set for 6/27/2017 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 6/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/15/2017. (fth) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Fri 05/12 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Trans Union, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent Advent International Corp., Corporate Parent GS Capital Partners, Corporate Parent Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.f/k/a TransUnion Corp., Corporate Parent TransUnion f/k/a TransUnion Holding Company, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Frontino, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 05/12 3:00 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Frontino, Brian) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/11 10:18 AM
ORDER granting5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 5/12/2017. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/10/2017. (fth) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/07 2:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Trans Union, LLC, filed by Florence Morris. (Shay, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/05 12:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC. (Frontino, Brian)Attorney Brian C Frontino added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/17 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Florence Morris(Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Florence Morris(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/15 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Ibey on behalf of Florence Morris (Ibey, Jason)Attorney Jason A. Ibey added to party Florence Morris(pty:pla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 12:32 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mpl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 12:29 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9899281.), filed by Florence Morris. The new case number is 3:17-cv-511-BEN-AGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Kazerounian, Abbas)(mpl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |