Rodriguez-Rodriguez v. USA
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas J Whelan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00513 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2019 |
Petitioner
Gabriel Rodriguez-Rodriguez
|
|
Respondent
USA
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment - Clerk 2255 FORM
Wed 06/19 11:50 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED *Petitioner's Petition is granted with respect to his claim for ineffective assistance of counsel based on counsel's alleged failure to follow Petitioner's instruction to file a notice of appeal, and judgment shall be entered accordingly in favor of Petitioner in civil csae 17cv513 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255
Wed 06/19 11:43 AM
ORDER Granting In Part Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/19/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/18 1:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA vacating the USDC's2 order and remanding to the USDC for further proceedings as to the Notice of Appeal filed in case number 3:16-cr-00374-W-1. (See docket for related case number 3:16-cr-00374-W-1 for related appellate documents.) (akr) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment - Clerk 2255
Fri 02/23 12:55 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255 is denied.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) |
|
2 | 2
7
pgs
order
Order on Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255
Fri 02/23 12:40 PM
ORDER Denying Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/23/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255
Wed 03/15 2:02 PM
Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255, filed by Gabriel Rodriguez-Rodriguez. (jao) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |