Sinn, Ruth v. Berryhill, Nancy
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Conley |
Referred: | Peter A Oppeneer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00201 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Tue 09/12 12:00 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Ruth Sinn against Nancy A. Berryhill awarding plaintiff attorney fees and costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412 in the amount of $8,220.40. (voc) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 09/12 11:56 AM
ORDER granting12 Undated Stipulation for Attorneys' Fees Under the EAJA . Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/12/2017. (voc) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation
Thu 09/07 1:02 PM
Undated Stipulation for Attorneys' Fees Under the EAJA by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, (Schwartz, Alison) Modified on 9/7/2017: Name of Judge on Order. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Tue 08/08 4:03 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff Ruth Sinn remanding this case for further proceedings under sentence four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (arw) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Tue 08/08 3:34 PM
ORDER granting9 Joint Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/8/2017. (arw) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand
Mon 08/07 3:49 PM
Joint MOTION TO REMAND by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Schwartz, Alison) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/07 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Alison Talbert Schwartz for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Schwartz, Alison) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 07/03 9:23 AM
Brief in Support of5 Social Security Hearing Transcript,, Requesting Review and Remand of the Final Decision by the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by Plaintiff Ruth Sinn (de la Torre, Adriana) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/17 2:48 PM
ANSWER by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Social Security Hearing Transcript
Wed 05/17 2:47 PM
Social Security Hearing Transcript by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Brief in Support due 7/3/2017. Brief in Opposition due 8/15/2017. Brief in Reply due 8/30/2017. (Humphrey, Richard) Modified on 5/17/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit - Social Security Hearing Transcript, Continued | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 03/29 3:55 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/29/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (de la Torre, Adriana) Modified on 3/29/2017: Corrected docketing event and answer due date. 60 days for government. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Green Cards | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/29 4:19 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Nancy A. Berryhill answer due 5/30/2017. (lak) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (voc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 11:05 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Adriana Maria de la Torre for Plaintiff Ruth Sinn. (de la Torre, Adriana) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT Seeking Judicial Review against Nancy A. Berryhill. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1990239.) ( Sealed Document ), filed by Ruth Sinn. (de la Torre, Adriana) Modified on 3/16/2017: Complaint refers to Western District of Indiana. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Thu 03/16 12:01 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (voc) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Thu 03/16 12:02 PM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (voc) |