John Oyer v. City of Kansas City, Missouri, et al
Original Case: 4:16-cv-00982
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01559 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 12, 2017 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
City of Kansas City, Missouri
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sly James, Mayor
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kansas City Zoo
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Friends of the Zoo
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Randy Wistkoff, Zoo Director
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of Missouri
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Peter Kinder, Lt. Gov
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kansas City Police Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
KCPD Officer John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
16th Circuit Court
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
John Oyer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/12/2017 3:35 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4512476] 17-1559 (EDG) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Orders dated 2/1/17 and 3/9/17. [4512490] 17-1559 (EDG) | ||
CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4512491] 17-1559 (EDG) | ||
MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. John Oyer w/service 03/15/2017. (Motion provided from 17-1485 [4512494] 17-1559 (EDG) |