Kenneth O'Bryant v. World Management Inc.
Original Case: 4:16-cv-00836
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01561 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 13, 2017 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
World Management Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kenneth O'Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/13/2017 3:27 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4512553] 17-1561 (CMH) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order dated 10/21/2016, Memorandum & Order dated 12/8/2016. [4512573] 17-1561 (CMH) | ||
CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4512581] 17-1561 (CMH) |