Isis Naguib v. Trimark Hotel Corporation, et al
Original Case: 0:15-cv-03966
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01560 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 3:26 AM CDT |
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Employee Lawyers Association of the Upper Midwest
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Trimark Hotel Corporation, a Texas corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
M&C Hotel Interest Inc., a Delaware corporation, doing business as Millennium Hotel & Resorts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Isis Naguib
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/12/2018 3:26 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4512536] 17-1560 (CYZ) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 2/14/2017, judgment of 2/15/2017 [4512544] 17-1560 (CYZ) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/24/2017. Appendix due 05/04/2017. BRIEF APPELLANT, Isis Naguib due 05/04/2017 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4512546] 17-1560 (CYZ) |