AVON 8539 CORP.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Carla E Craig |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-41242 |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Debtor
AVON 8539 CORP.
8539 Avon St
Jamaica, NY 11432-2303 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert J Musso
26 Court Street Suite 2211
Brooklyn, NY 11242 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 03/16/2017 10:30 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Thu 03/16 5:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(1 17-41242 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15250576. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign)
Thu 03/16 9:58 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Business & Appointment of Chapter 7 Trustee, Robert J Musso, , 341(a) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 03/16 5:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Patrick Christopher on behalf of AVON 8539 CORP. (Christopher, Patrick) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1
Thu 03/16 5:16 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Patrick Christopher on behalf of AVON 8539 CORP. (Christopher, Patrick) |