Shawe et al v. Pincus, Esq. et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory M Sleet |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00277 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jeffrey W. Bullock
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert B. Pincus, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip R. Shawe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Shawe
|
Represented By
|
1. | TransPerfect CEO Phil Shaw files federal lawsuit against Delaware over law (delawareonline.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 05/08 8:33 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to36 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe. USCA Decision: Dismissing pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (cg1) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order - -Memorandum and Order
Fri 10/27 12:34 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER - denying plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Pending Determination of Appeal. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/27/2017. (mdb) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
Tue 10/24 3:32 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re38 MOTION to Stay Pending Determination of Appeal filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2017.(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Statement
Tue 10/17 7:10 PM
STATEMENT re38 MOTION to Stay Pending Determination of Appeal pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Shirley Shawe. (Eicher, Jeremy) |
|
misc
Deficiency re Certificate for Nondispositive Motions
Tue 10/17 9:41 AM
LOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI38 . Please file the averment using the event code STATEMENT, found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. (mdb) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Mon 10/16 8:38 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re38 MOTION to Stay Pending Determination of Appeal filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/30/2017. (Eicher, Jeremy) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Stay
Mon 10/16 8:35 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Determination of Appeal - filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe.(Eicher, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit
Wed 10/04 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re36 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe. USCA Case Number 17-3185 USCA Case Manager: Tonya (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (tw, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit
Tue 10/03 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of35 Order,, Terminated Case, . Appeal filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe. (Finger, David) |
|
appeal
- APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only)
Tue 10/03 10:42 AM
APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re36 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2236765.) (Finger, David) |
||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 09/26 4:09 PM
ORDER re34 Memorandum Opinion - Defendants' motions to dismiss (D.I.11 ; D.I.14 ; D.I.31 ; D.I.32 ) are GRANTED; Plaintiffs' supplemental complaint (D.I.30 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and the clerk of court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/26/2017. ***Civil Case Terminated*** (mdb) |
|
34 | 34
15
pgs
order
Opinion - Memorandum Opinion
Tue 09/26 4:07 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/26/2017. (mdb) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 09/22 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Robert B. Pincus, Esq. re32 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Holland v. Bouchard, et al. | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction
Tue 09/19 4:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq.. (Herrmann, Douglas) Modified on 9/19/2017 (mdb) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction
Tue 09/19 9:30 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Jeffrey W. Bullock. (Handlon, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
cmp
Complaint - Amended
Thu 09/07 1:20 PM
Supplemental AMENDED COMPLAINT For Violation of Civil Rights against Jeffrey W. Bullock, Robert B. Pincus, Esq.- filed by Shirley Shawe, Philip R. Shawe.(Eicher, Jeremy) Modified on 9/7/2017 (mdb) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 09/06 9:00 AM
SO ORDERED - re29 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(d). The supplemental pleading shall be filed within five days of this order. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/6/2017. (mdb) |
||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/01 9:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(d) - filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe.(Eicher, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Complaint Clean version of Supplemental Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Amended Complaint Redline Version of Supplemental Pleading | ||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Thu 07/13 3:37 PM
Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Douglas Herrmann, Esq. regarding the status of the ongoing court-ordered sales process. (Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 07/12 10:44 AM
NOTICE of of Subsequent Authority by Robert B. Pincus, Esq. re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter (Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Shawe v Elting 2017 WL 2813060 (NY Sup Ct NY Cty June 29 2017) | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Request for Oral Argument
Fri 06/09 2:06 PM
REQUEST for Oral Argument by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter . (Eicher, Jeremy) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Declaration
Thu 06/08 4:08 PM
DECLARATION re24 Reply Brief, of Douglas D. Herrmann in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit D | ||
24 | 24
respm
Brief - Reply
Thu 06/08 4:05 PM
Joint REPLY BRIEF re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq.. (Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 06/05 2:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limit - filed by Jeffrey W. Bullock. (Maguire, Lauren) Modified on 6/5/2017 (mdb) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 06/05 3:48 PM
SO ORDERED - re23 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limit filed by Jeffrey W. Bullock. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/5/2017. (mdb) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
Thu 05/25 5:48 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2017.(Eicher, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeremy D. Eicher, Esq. | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 05/17 3:05 PM
ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as a Consolidated Answering Brief (17 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/17/2017. (mdb) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/16 2:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as a Consolidated Answering Brief filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe. (Finger, David) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 05/15 3:48 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as a Consolidated Answering Brief filed by Jeffrey W. Bullock. (Maguire, Lauren) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 05/15 11:16 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as a Consolidated Answering Brief filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 05/11 12:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as a Consolidated Answering Brief - filed by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe.(Eicher, Jeremy) Modified on 5/11/2017 (mdb) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Answering Brief in Excess of Page Limit | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply
Wed 05/10 2:07 PM
SO ORDERED - re16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Motion to Dismiss to May 25, 2017 filed by Shirley Shawe, Set Briefing Schedule: re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter . (Answering Briefs due 5/25/2017., Reply Briefs due 6/8/2017). Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/10/2017. (mdb) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Thu 05/04 5:24 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Motion to Dismiss to May 25, 2017 - filed by Shirley Shawe. (Eicher, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Mon 04/24 3:56 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeffrey W. Bullock.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/8/2017. (Maguire, Lauren) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction Dismiss/Fail to State Claim
Mon 04/24 3:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Jeffrey W. Bullock. (Maguire, Lauren) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Mon 04/24 3:36 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/8/2017. (Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/24 3:21 PM
DECLARATION re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter /of Douglas D. Herrmann in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction
Mon 04/24 3:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Mon 04/24 11:30 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney David B. Goldstein for Philip R. Shawe added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 04/12 11:24 AM
SO ORDERED - re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William T. Burke filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq.,10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles Davant, IV filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq.,9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anne M. Rucker filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq.,8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John K. Villa filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/12/2017. (mdb) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/11 3:10 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles Davant, IV - filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Charles Davant, IV, Esq. | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/11 3:07 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anne M. Rucker - filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Anne M. Rucker, Esq. | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/11 3:04 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John K. Villa - filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of John K. Villa, Esq. | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/11 3:02 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William T. Burke - filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq..(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of William T. Burke, Esq. | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 04/04 12:06 PM
SO ORDERED - re6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to April 24, 2017 filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Jeffrey W. Bullock answer due 4/24/2017; Robert B. Pincus, Esq. answer due 4/24/2017.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/4/2017. (mdb) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Mon 04/03 3:43 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to April 24, 2017 - filed by Robert B. Pincus, Esq.. (Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/03 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Daniel Herrmann on behalf of Robert B. Pincus, Esq.(Herrmann, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 04/03 3:06 PM
SO ORDERED - re4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David B, Goldstein filed by Philip R. Shawe. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/3/2017. (mdb) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 9:12 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David B, Goldstein - filed by Philip R. Shawe.(Finger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of David B. Goldstein | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 03/28 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge of State Statute by Philip R. Shawe, Shirley Shawe re1 Complaint (Finger, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/22 11:57 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
service
No Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 8:32 AM
No Summons Issued. (jcs) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 12:52 PM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Jeffrey W. Bullock on 3/16/2017; Robert B. Pincus, Esq. on 3/16/2017. (lmm) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Thu 03/16 8:32 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 8:31 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Jeffrey W. Bullock, Robert B. Pincus, Esq. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2103784.) - filed by Shirley Shawe, Philip R. Shawe.(jcs) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |