Hansell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John E Martin |
Referred: | John E Martin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00117 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 11/06 12:58 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $8,007.05. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/6/18. (nal) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 11/02 4:20 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees AGREED MOTION TO AWARD ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT by Plaintiff James J Hansell.(Schultz, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 EAJA Itemization of Time | ||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Clerks Judgment
Tue 08/14 4:09 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (jss) |
|
20 | 20
9
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/14 4:08 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby GRANTS the relief requested in Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Reversing the Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security13 , and REMANDS this matter for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/14/2018. (jss) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
ss
Social Security Reply Brief of Plaintiff
Fri 02/02 3:46 PM
REPLY BRIEF re18 Social Security Response Brief of Government by James J Hansell. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
ss
Social Security Response Brief of Government
Mon 01/22 11:22 AM
RESPONSE BRIEF re17 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff by Commissioner of Social Security. (Hinsley, Jay) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
ss
Social Security Opening Brief of Plaintiff
Fri 12/08 1:24 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Reversing the Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security by James J Hansell. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 10/20 2:12 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 12/11/2017. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/19/2017. No pdf attached. (cpb) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 10/19 5:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by Plaintiff James J Hansell. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard
Tue 10/10 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge John E Martin for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2007-10 from Magistrate Judge John E Martin and Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen to Magistrate Judge John E Martin. (kjp) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
Mon 09/18 10:52 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/10/2017. (smb) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Setting Social Security Deadlines
Mon 09/18 10:52 AM
ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 10/27/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 12/8/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 12/22/2017. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/18/2017. (smb) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
ss
Social Security Administrative Record
Fri 09/15 4:42 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 07/26 12:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo James J Hansell. Office of Regional Chief Counsel served on 7/18/2017 (jss) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 07/26 12:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo James J Hansell. US Attorney General served on 7/17/2017 (jss) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 07/26 12:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo James J Hansell. US Attorney served on 7/18/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (jss) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 07/03 12:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. cc: USMS (tc) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/03 12:44 PM
ORDER: Court GRANTS3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the filing fee; and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on Defendant. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/3/2017. cc: USMS (tc) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/03 12:42 PM
Proposed Summons filed by James J Hansell. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/20 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C Hinsley on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hinsley, Jay) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 4:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James J Hansell. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A Schultz on behalf of James J Hansell (Schultz, Barry) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by James J Hansell.(Schultz, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 AC Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 USM forms | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/16 4:47 PM
Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. *NEW CASE, IFP PENDING* (jss) |