Carranza v. Department of Child Services
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Miller, Jr |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00215 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Department of Child Services Kosciusko County
|
|
Defendant
Department of Child Services of St Joseph County
|
|
Defendant
Indiana State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Silvia Regina Carranza
1305 College Street
South Bend, IN 46628 |
|
Plaintiff
IMW
|
|
Plaintiff
LAW
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Department of Child Services
Terminated: 05/01/2017
|
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 11/08 12:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to11 Notice of Appeal filed by Silvia Regina Carranza: On consideration of the papers filed in this appeal and review of the short record, IT IS ORDERED that the appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. On consideration of the petition for rehearing filed in the above-entitled cause by pro se Plaintiff-Appellant, Silvia Carranza, on October 18, 2017, all of the judges on the original panel have voted to deny a rehearing. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the aforesaid petition for rehearing is DENIED.(nae) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Final Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certified Rehearing Denial Order | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 09/12 4:29 PM
CIRCUIT RULE 3(b) FEE NOTICE from USCA. (nae) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 08/28 12:55 PM
ORDER: The Court DENIES the motions for extension of time to file notice of appeal13 and for leave to appeal in forma pauperis12 . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 08/24 11:52 AM
USCA Case Number 17-2729 for11 Notice of Appeal filed by Silvia Regina Carranza. (nae) |
|
14 | 14
appeal
Short Record Sent to USCA
Wed 08/23 9:25 AM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re11 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (jld) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Wed 08/23 8:25 AM
Letter from USCA transferring Notice of Appeal and related documents to the District Court. (NOTE: the letter was received 8/21/17 and the documents are file-marked 8/11/17) (jld) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/23 9:18 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal due to change of address by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Carranza. (jld) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/23 9:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Carranza. (jld) |
|
11 | 11
appeal
Notice of Appeal - court user
Wed 08/23 8:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to6 Opinion and Order,, Order Dismissing Case,7 Clerks Judgment by Silvia Regina Carranza.(jld) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/29 3:05 PM
ORDER denying8 Second Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/29/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/21 9:40 AM
Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Carranza. (nae) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Clerks Judgment
Mon 06/12 3:10 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Order Dismissing Case
Mon 06/12 3:09 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Carranza and DISMISSING her case. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/12/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Tue 05/02 11:15 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Department of Child Services Kosciusko County, Indiana State of, Department of Child Services of St Joseph County, filed by Silvia Regina Carranza. (No IFP or filling fee submitted) (nae) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 10:27 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert L Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 03/28 7:52 AM
ORDER DENIES1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Carranza; GRANTS Silvia Regina Carranza until 4/28/2017, to file a complaint, accompanied by a new Petition to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs or the filing fee; CAUTIONS her that if she does not respond by that date, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/27/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 03/16 4:28 PM
NOTICE - Civil Cover Sheet by Silvia Regina Carranza. **No complaint form received** (nae) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 4:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Carranza. **No complaint received. (nae) |