Progressive Machinery Inc.
Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brett H Ludwig |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-22173 |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Debtor
Progressive Machinery Inc.
W60 N171 Cardinal Avenue
Cedarburg, WI 53012 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Bruce A. Lanser
N14 W24200 Tower Place Suite 201
Waukesha, WI 53188 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
Docket last updated: 03/17/2017 12:04 AM CDT |
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 03/16 3:42 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-22173 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 14962536. Fee amount 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 03/16 3:42 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 04/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Milwaukee, Room 428A, U.S. Courthouse, 517 East Wisconsin Ave. Milwaukee, WI 53202. (Leverson, Leonard) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)
Thu 03/16 3:38 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Filed by Progressive Machinery Inc. Fee Amount: $335. (Leverson, Leonard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 03/16 5:23 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Leonard G. Leverson on behalf of Progressive Machinery Inc.. (Leverson, Leonard) |