Sullen v. Dunn et al (INMATE 2)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | Jerusha T Adams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00151 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
63 | 63
appeal
USCA Entry of Dismissal
Wed 08/05 9:14 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal issued as Mandate of USCA as to55 Notice of Appeal filed by Willie Arthur Sullen, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 20-11486 D: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Willie Arthur Sullen has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules, effective August 5, 2020. FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. (dmn, ) |