Butler v. City of Danville, Illinois et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colin Stirling Bruce |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02057 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Danville, Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Damilano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doug Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Troy Wasson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Josh Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua Edington
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dawn Hartshorn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruce Stark
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Police Officers
|
|
Defendant
Phil Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Butler, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/12 3:42 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/12/2018. Pursuant to Stipulation of Dismissal48 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated. (DS, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/11 7:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to all defendants by Robert Butler, Jr. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Mon 12/11 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Avi Tzvi Kamionski on behalf of Robert Butler, Jr (Kamionski, Avi) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Take Deposition
Mon 11/06 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/6/2017. Defendant's Agreed Motion to Take the Deposition of an Incarcerated Person Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 30(a)(2)(B)46 is GRANTED. The Court grants leave for the deposition of Damon Williams. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
motion
Take Deposition
Fri 11/03 2:00 PM
MOTION to Take Deposition from Damon Williams 'AGREED" by Defendants Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson. Responses due by 11/17/2017 (Casey, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 10/31 11:19 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/31/2017. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the status conference set for 2/6/18 is RESCHEDULED to 2/13/18 at 10:15 A.M. The Court will initiate the call. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/02 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Filing re44 Notice to Take Deposition (Casey, Kevin) |
|
44 | 44
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Mon 10/02 1:34 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Butler, Jr. on October 17, 2017 by Defendants Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson.(Casey, Kevin) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 09/18 3:30 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/18/2017. Pursuant to Joint Stipulation to Voluntarily Dismiss Scott Damilano43 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendant Scott Damilano is hereby terminated from this case. This case remains set for a status conference before Judge Eric Long on 2/6/18 at 10:00 A.M. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Sunday, September 17, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Stipulation
Sun 09/17 12:33 AM
STIPULATION (JOINT) TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS SCOTT DAMILANO by Robert Butler, Jr.. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Status Conference - Referral Judge
Tue 08/29 2:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 8/29/2017 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Shneur Zalman Nathan. Appearance for the Defendants by Kevin Casey and Michael Condon. Status Conference held. Status of the case and discovery discussed. Further Status Conference set for 2/6/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long.) Option for settlement offered. (Tape #UR-B: 10:02AM.) (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/25 4:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group.(Condon, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Certificate
Thu 07/13 2:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service, Answer to Complaint . (Casey, Kevin) |
|
40 | 40
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/13 1:58 PM
Danville Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson.(Casey, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 07/06 3:51 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/6/2017. For the reasons stated in the order, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss20 and32 are DENIED. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for further proceedings in accordance with this order. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 07/05 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Shneur Zalman Nathan (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Response to Motion/Petition
Wed 06/21 6:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Robert Butler, Jr. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Certificate
Fri 06/16 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service, City of Danville's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for the Production of Documents . (Casey, Kevin) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Mon 06/12 2:19 PM
AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/12/17. See written Order. (KM, ilcd) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 06/12 2:14 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/12/17. Defendants' Motion for Approval of Agreed Confidentiality Order34 is GRANTED. The Court will enter the Confidentiality Order separately. (KM, ilcd) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Protective Order
Fri 06/09 12:46 PM
MOTION for Protective Order AGREED by Defendants Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson. Responses due by 6/23/2017(Casey, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition
Wed 06/07 2:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group.(Wysocki, Yordana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
32 | 32
motion
Dismiss
Wed 06/07 2:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group. Responses due by 6/21/2017 (Wysocki, Yordana) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16
Thu 05/25 4:26 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held 5/25/2017 before Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Shneur Nathan. Appearance for Defendant by Kevin Casey and Michael Condon. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 6/7/2017. Amended pleadings due by 1/31/2018. Joinder of parties due by 1/31/2018. Parties expert disclosure due by 5/1/2018. Parties shall make experts available for deposition by 6/1/2018. Rebuttal experts shall be disclosed by 7/1/2018. Rebuttal experts depositions shall be done by 8/1/2018. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2018. Discovery due by 8/1/2018. Case dispositive motions due by 8/24/2018. Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 2/1/2019 at 2:00 PM by personal appearance before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Selection/Jury Trial is scheduled for 2/4/2019 at 9:30 PM before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana, (10 days). Status Hearing set before Judge Long on 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial.(Tape #UR-B 11:01AM.) (JMB, ilcd) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Certificate of Service/Counsel
Thu 05/25 9:46 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Danville Defendants' Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Kevin M Casey on behalf of Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson (Casey, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Interest
Wed 05/24 1:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group. (Wysocki, Yordana) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Wed 05/24 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Yordana Wysocki on behalf of Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group (Wysocki, Yordana) |
|
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 05/24 11:31 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/24/2017. Upon the request of the parties, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for May 25, 2017, at 10:00 AM is RESCHEDULED to the same date at 11:00 AM. The Court will initiate the call. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response to Motion/Petition
Tue 05/23 5:22 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re20 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Robert Butler, Jr. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 05/22 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Shneur Zalman Nathan (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 05/17 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/17/2017. Defendant Vermillion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings25 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to June 7, 2017. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Wed 05/17 11:40 AM
Reset Deadlines: Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group answer due 6/7/2017 pursuant to the text order dated 5/17/2017. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 05/16 2:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendant Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group. Responses due by 5/30/2017(Condon, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Affidavit of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Interest
Wed 05/10 12:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group. (Condon, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Wed 05/10 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael W Condon on behalf of Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group (Condon, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Certificate of Service/Counsel
Tue 05/09 2:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re21 Memorandum in Support of Motion,20 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Kevin M Casey on behalf of Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson (Casey, Kevin) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition
Tue 05/09 2:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson.(Casey, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss
Tue 05/09 2:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendants Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson. Responses due by 5/23/2017 (Casey, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/02 1:16 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/2/2017. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting19 and pursuant to the Order18 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on May 25, 2017, at 10:00 AM, the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call.(JMB, ilcd) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 05/01 9:39 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Robert Butler, Jr. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16)
Tue 04/25 9:46 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/25/2017. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (DS, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/05 10:05 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/5/2017. Defendants City of Danville and Danville Officers' Unopposed Motion Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint16 is GRANTED. Defendants City of Danville and Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Scott Damilano, Phil Wilson, Bruce Stark, Joshua Edington, Josh Campbell and Troy Wassons deadline to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to May 9, 2017. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Tue 04/04 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Patrick S Wall on behalf of Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson (Wall, Patrick) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 04/04 4:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by Defendants Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson. Responses due by 4/18/2017 (Casey, Kevin) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Tue 04/04 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Dominick L Lanzito on behalf of Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson (Lanzito, Dominick) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Tue 04/04 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kevin M Casey on behalf of Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson (Casey, Kevin) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Phil Wilson served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Troy Wasson served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Bruce Stark served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Doug Miller served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Dawn Hartshorn served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Joshua Edington served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Scott Damilano served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. City of Danville, Illinois served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Fri 03/24 1:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Butler, Jr. Josh Campbell served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 8:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Josh Campbell, City of Danville, Illinois, Scott Damilano, Joshua Edington, Dawn Hartshorn, Doug Miller, Bruce Stark, Vermilion County Metropolitan Enforcement Group, Troy Wasson, Phil Wilson and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Designation of Lead Counsel
Thu 03/16 6:34 PM
Designation of Lead Counsel by Shneur Zalman Nathan on behalf of Robert Butler, Jr. (Nathan, Shneur) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Thu 03/16 6:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2530971.), filed by Robert Butler, Jr.(Nathan, Shneur) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |