Hardin v. Sperfslage et al
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Pratt |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00100 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Reconsideration
Mon 04/24 3:17 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion for Reconsideration re3 Initial Review Order,4 Judgment filed by Romeo Casino Hardin. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 4/24/2017. (don, ) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 04/10 2:45 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re3 Initial Review Order,4 Judgment by Romeo Casino Hardin. (don, ) |
|
Att: 1 cover letter | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment
Fri 03/24 12:21 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Jerry Bartruff, William Sperfslage against Romeo Casino Hardin. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 3/24/2017. (cc) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Review Order
Tue 03/21 4:52 PM
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER dismissing case without prejudice and granting2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 3/21/2017. (sjc) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 2:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Romeo Casino Hardin. (cc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 03/16 2:50 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Romeo Casino Hardin. (cc) |
|
Att: 1 attachment, | ||
Att: 2 attachment |