Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund et al v. Quality Services Laboratories, Inc.
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Julie A Robinson |
Referred: | Gwynne E Birzer |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02158 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Quality Services Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Fultz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/12 6:06 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz. (Brown, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Administratively Closing Case
Wed 10/31 4:00 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by November 29, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/31/18. (hw) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Tue 10/30 2:11 PM
STATUS REPORT , JOINT by Quality Services Laboratories, Inc.. (McCallum, Sara) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Wed 10/03 11:29 AM
ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE. A telephone status conference was convened on 10/3/18. Plaintiffs appeared through counsel, Scott L. Brown. Defendant appeared through counsel, Sara McCallum. After consultation with counsel, the Court ORDERS that this case shall remain stayed until 10/31/18 to allow the parties time to complete settlement discussions. The parties shall submit a joint status report to the Court by 10/31/18. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/3/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 10/03 11:23 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/3/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 10/03 10:35 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sara McCallum on behalf of Quality Services Laboratories, Inc.. (McCallum, Sara) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Mon 10/01 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Uzo N. Nwonwu as to Quality Services Laboratories, Inc. (Place, Jeffrey) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/01 5:03 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Quality Services Laboratories, Inc.. (Place, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 05/31 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in Telephone GEB - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 9686294 before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Cancelled Hearing
Thu 05/31 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Status Conference set for 6/1/18 at 1:30 PM is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 05/31 3:37 PM
ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Upon request of the parties, the Court ORDERS that the case shall remain stayed until 10/1/18 to allow the parties to complete the arbitration process. The parties shall submit a joint status report to the Court by 9/26/18. The Status Conference set for 06/01/18 will be cancelled and rescheduled for 10/03/2018 at 11:00 a.m. A separate notice of hearing will be issued for the 10/03/18 status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/31/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel
Thu 04/26 4:17 PM
WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Carol A. Krstulic and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by Scott L. Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 02/28 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 6/1/2018 at 01:30 PM to be held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Counsel are directed to call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 9686294 to participate. |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Cancelled Hearing
Wed 02/28 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Status Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 1:30 PM is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 02/28 4:56 PM
ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Upon review of the Joint Status Report [ECF No. 11] submitted by counsel, the Court ORDERS that the case shall remain stayed for an additional 90 days to allow the parties to complete the arbitration process. The Status Conference set for 03/02/18 will be cancelled and rescheduled for 06/01/2018 at 1:30 PM. A separate notice of hearing will be issued for the 6/01/18 status conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/28/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Tue 02/27 4:38 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Quality Services Laboratories, Inc.. (Nwonwu, Uzoamaka) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 10/31 12:06 PM
ORDER. A telephone status conference was convened on October 30, 2017. Plaintiffs appeared through counsel, Carol Krstulic. Defendant appeared through counsel, Uzoamaka Nwonwu. After consultation with counsel, the Court ORDERS that this case remain STAYED for an additional 120 days. At the conclusion of the arbitration process, or no later than February 28, 2018, whichever occurs earlier, the parties shall submit a joint status report to the Court, outlining the progress of arbitration and the parties' positions regarding any continuing stay. A Status Conference is set for 3/2/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer via telephone conference call, to be initiated by the Court unless otherwise instructed prior to the conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/31/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 10/30 11:42 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/30/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Setting Status Conference
Tue 08/01 1:55 PM
ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Upon review of the Joint Status Report [ECF No. 8] submitted by counsel, the Court ORDERS that the case shall remain stayed for an additional 90 days. A Status Conference is set for 10/30/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer via telephone conference call to be initiated by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/1/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/31 12:10 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz. (Krstulic, Carol) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Mon 07/24 4:42 PM
ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE. A telephone status conference was convened on July 24, 2017. Plaintiffs appeared through counsel, Carol Krstulic. Defendant appeared through counsel, Uzoamaka Nwonwu. After consultation with counsel, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint report to the Court no later than July 31, 2017, outlining the activities regarding the grievance procedure since April 24, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/24/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 07/24 4:43 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/24/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Stay Case
Mon 04/24 2:06 PM
ORDER granting5 Joint Motion to Stay. Status conference set July 24, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone conference call to be initiated by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/24/17. (sj) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stay Case
Fri 04/14 10:46 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Quality Services Laboratories, Inc. (Nwonwu, Uzoamaka) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer
Thu 04/13 10:02 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until April 28, 2017 for Defendant Quality Services Laboratories, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/13/2017. (cv) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Mon 03/27 10:11 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz upon Quality Services Laboratories, Inc. served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017 (Krstulic, Carol) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/16 8:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz. (Krstulic, Carol) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Thu 03/16 8:13 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4122329.), filed by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz.(Krstulic, Carol) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 03/16 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 9:12 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quality Services Laboratories, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (cv) |