13
|
|
13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/14 9:26 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Kupka, Laurel)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
adr
ADR Report
Wed 06/14 9:22 AM
ADR REPORT by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. ADR session held on: 6/7/2017 and conducted by Jim Margolin. Results of ADR: Case settled at ADR. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Kupka, Laurel)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 06/14 2:18 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per 13 Stipulation of Dismissal.(hl)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/24 4:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures with CD by Mindi Cook. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
misc
Certificate of Compliance
Wed 05/24 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiff Mindi Cook Report of Parties' Planning Conference . (Pistotnik, Bradley)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 05/17 3:33 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company of taking deposition of Mindi Cook on June 5, 2017 (Kupka, Laurel)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 05/10 10:22 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Laurel R. Kupka on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Kupka, Laurel)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 05/10 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) By agreement of the parties, the Scheduling Conference set 5/31/17 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 7/10/2017 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The parties' planning report and Rule 26 disclosures will remain due 5/24/17.(ss)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/02 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Defendant by Mindi Cook. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Thu 04/20 10:30 AM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/24/2017. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/20/17. (ss)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/19 12:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Cramer, James)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Mon 03/27 2:47 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Mindi Cook upon Shelter Mutual Insurance Company served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017(Pistotnik, Bradley)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/16 8:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Mindi Cook. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Thu 03/16 8:39 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4122352.), filed by Mindi Cook.(Pistotnik, Bradley)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 03/16 9:06 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 9:09 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (cv)
Related: [-]
|