Parfait v. Neal et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Ann Vial Lemmon |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02115 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 05/23 9:44 AM
ORDER:IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court terminate the deficiency on the Motion to Proceed as a Pauper2 for purposes of entering this Order.IT IS ORDERED that the application is denied because plaintiff has not submitted "a certified copy of the trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint" as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a)(2).Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/22/2017.(my) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
Mon 04/17 11:17 AM
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re1 Complaint2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/8/2017. (ajn) (Mailed to Plaintiff at Jackson Parish Correctional Center pending Notice of Change of Address Form) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
Thu 03/16 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re1 Complaint,2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/6/2017. (mf) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 10:26 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frampton Faro Joseph Parfait. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against S Bergeron, David Dingler, Rhonda Ledet, Patricia Naquin, Richard Peter Neal, Terrebonne Parish Sheriff's Office Staff Monitors, McClaude Triche filed by Frampton Faro Joseph Parfait.(mf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |