Grant v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02225 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Antonio A Grant
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
30+
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/24 12:58 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE per Order rec. doc. 17359 filed in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/15/2019.(dw) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 11:13 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 03/16 4:24 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 4:22 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG filed by Antonio A Grant re1 Complaint,.(Lowe, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6029753) filed by Antonio A Grant.Attorney Zachary Peter Lowe added to party Antonio A Grant(pty:pla).(Lowe, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |