Funchess v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02227 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Funchess
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/10 4:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 11:14 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 9:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (ss) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 03/16 4:45 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6029824) filed by Susan Funchess, Deceased, Elizabeth Funchess.Attorney Roger C. Denton added to party Elizabeth Funchess(pty:pla), Attorney Roger C. Denton added to party Susan Funchess, Deceased(pty:pla).(Denton, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |