Frey et al v. Christus Health Southwestern Louisiana et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James T Trimble, Jr |
Referred: | Kathleen Kay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00403 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:56 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sylvia Mathews Burwell
|
|
Defendant
Christus Health Southwestern Louisiana
|
|
Defendant
U S Dept of Health & Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lesa Frey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucinda Youngblood
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Wed 08/16 4:59 PM
JUDGMENT granting9 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, with all costs of court to be borne by the Plaintiffs.Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 8/16/2017. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 08/24 4:33 PM
***Judge James T Trimble, Jr added. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. Administrative entry due to Judgment of Dismissal signed by Judge Trimble and for statistical purposes (NEF deselected to counsel). (crt,Reeves, T) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/11 11:10 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Unassigned District Judge. Judge Patricia Minaldi no longer assigned to case. All pending motions are referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay for processing. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 8/7/2017. (crt,Benoit, T) |
|
utility
Motions Referred to Magistrate
Fri 08/11 11:12 AM
Motions referred to Magistrate Judge:9 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss All Claims . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Benoit, T) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Tue 08/08 10:36 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss All Claims by Lesa Frey, Kelly O'Brien, Victor O'Brien, Lucinda Youngblood.(aty,Hart, Randall) Modified on 8/8/2017 to edit text (Dauterive, C) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/08 2:19 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. ORDERED that the United States shall have an additional 45 days to file responsive pleadings in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/8/2017. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/07 5:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay.(Attorney Andolyn Reeves Johnson added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft))(aty,Johnson, Andolyn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 05/17 3:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor O'Brien, Kelly O'Brien, Lucinda Youngblood, Lesa Frey Christus Health Southwestern Louisiana served on 5/9/2017, answer due 7/10/2017., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor O'Brien; Kelly O'Brien; Lucinda Youngblood; Lesa Frey. Christus Health Southwestern Louisiana served on 5/9/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. (aty,Hart, Randall) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 05/12 4:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor O'Brien, Kelly O'Brien, Lucinda Youngblood, Lesa Frey Sylvia Mathews Burwell served on 4/19/2017, answer due 6/19/2017.(aty,Hart, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 05/12 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor O'Brien, Kelly O'Brien, Lucinda Youngblood, Lesa Frey U S Dept of Health & Human Services served on 4/19/2017, answer due 6/19/2017.(aty,Hart, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Factual basis for guilty plea Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Factual basis for guilty plea Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Wed 04/12 9:34 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christus Health Southwestern Louisiana (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - USA (Form Included)
Thu 03/16 2:19 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Christus Health Southwestern Louisiana, Sylvia Mathews Burwell, U S Department of Health and Human Services (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Sylvia Mathews Burwell, Christus Health Southwestern Louisiana, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3315854) filed by Lesa Fray, Kelly O'Brien, Lucinda Youngblood, Victor O'Brien.(Attorney Randall E Hart added to party Lesa Fray, Kelly O'Brien, Victor O'Brien and Lucinda Youngblood)(aty,Hart, Randall) Modified on 3/16/2017 to edit text (FinnSld, P). | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet Cover Sheet | ||
transfer
Divisional Transfer
Thu 03/16 2:04 PM
DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 3:17-cv-0403 from Monroe Division to Lake Charles Division. New Case Number 2:17-cv-0403. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/16 2:09 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Patricia Minaldi and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,FinnSld, P) |