Fuller v. D L Peterson Trust Co et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks, Jr |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00408 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Cross Claimant
Jorge Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Jack Ferrell
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Jack M Bailey, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Law Offices of Jack M Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Milan Mody
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Davis Law Office L L C
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
S P Davis, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
McLawrence Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Healthcare Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack Ferrell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Milan Mody
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jorge Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Law Offices of Jack M Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McLawrence Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
School Board of DeSoto Parish
201 Crosby St
Mansfield, LA 71052 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
S P Davis, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack M Bailey, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Interpleader
National Oilwell Varco L P
|
Represented By
|
Interpleader
Adam Keys
|
Represented By
|
Interpleader
National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
|
Represented By
|
Interpleader
D L Peterson Trust L L C
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Davis Law Office L L C
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
McLawrence Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
S P Davis, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Jack Ferrell
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Law Offices of Jack M Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Jack M Bailey, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Jorge Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Milan Mody
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
United Healthcare
Terminated: 04/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Terminated: 08/18/2017
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
136 | 136
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Sanctions
Tue 09/24 9:16 AM
ORDER denying124 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/24/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D) |
|
135 | 135
7
pgs
order
Memorandum Ruling
Tue 09/24 9:15 AM
MEMORANDUM RULING re124 MOTION for Sanctions filed by D L Peterson Trust L L C, Adam Keys, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, National Oilwell Varco L P. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/24/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D) |