BancorpSouth Bank v. Premiere Inc
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Foote |
Referred: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00405 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Premiere Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BancorpSouth Bank
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Mon 10/30 7:27 AM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by BancorpSouth Bank, Premier Inc. (aty,Ramos, Steven) Modified to add filer on 10/30/2017. (ThomasSld, T) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 10/30 1:47 PM
***CASE Reassigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to the case. Administrative entry due to joint stipulation of dismissal and for statistical purposes (NEF deselected to counsel). (crt,Whidden, C) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case
Thu 10/05 1:43 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Unassigned District Judge. Judge Rebecca F Doherty no longer assigned to case. All pending motions are referred to the assigned magistrate judge for processing. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 10/02/2017.(crt,Putch, A) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 09/29 12:06 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Continue Hearing without date. IT IS ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiff's7 First Amended Verified Motion for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration with Hearing be continued without date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiff's7 First Amended Verified Motion for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration with Hearing may be reset by either party upon motion to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/29/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Continue
Thu 09/28 1:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Sequestration with consent by BancorpSouth Bank. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Entry/Order Setting Motion
Wed 09/20 2:57 PM
ORDER RESETTING5 MOTION for Writ of Sequestration ,7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing : Motion set for 9/28/2017 10:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. The parties are to notify the Court immediately in the event an amicable settlement is reached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/20/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 09/18 5:28 PM
Phase I RULE 26(f) Report by BancorpSouth Bank . (aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order - Doherty
Mon 07/31 2:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/4/2018 9:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2018 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/21/2017. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/5/2017. Rule 26 Report due by 9/18/2017. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/5/2017. Discovery deadline 1/8/2018. Rule 26 Report - PHASE II due by 2/14/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 2/14/2018. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 3/26/2018. Expert Depositions due by 5/14/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2018. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 7/24/2018. Motions in Limine due by 7/24/2018. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 8/9/2018. Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2018. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 7/31/17. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Thu 07/13 9:47 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re17 Order on Motion for Hearing, based on the Parties' Joint Motion for Continuance, the Hearing set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst is Continued to September 20, 2017 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/13/2017. (crt,Kallam, Michelle) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/13 9:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing . Motion day set for 9/20/2017 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chicola, C) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 07/07 7:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing filed by BancorpSouth Bank. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 07/07 7:41 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/7/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 07/06 6:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum with consent by BancorpSouth Bank.(aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Reply Memorandum | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Fri 07/07 7:45 AM
Motions Transferred regarding19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum with consent . Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/19 5:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing filed by Premiere Inc. (aty,Brinlee, Jared) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 06/01 2:31 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Hearing Motion set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition memorandum is due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/1/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/01 2:32 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing . Responses due by 6/19/2017 (crt,Chicola, C) |
||
Monday, May 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Hearing
Mon 05/29 7:23 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing with certificate of service by BancorpSouth Bank. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/15 8:59 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Premiere Inc.(aty,Perret, Henry) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 8:31 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Premiere Inc. (aty,Perret, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/18 4:01 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Premiere, Inc. is granted an extension of 30 days to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/18/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 04/13 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Henry C Perret, Jr on behalf of Premiere Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/27/2017. (crt,Williams, L) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/13 2:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, with opposition , by Premiere Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(Attorney Henry C Perret, Jr added to party Premiere Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Perret, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 03/30 11:32 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Court will RESERVE its ruling on7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing filed by BancorpSouth Bank until after Defendant Premiere, Inc. has filed its responsive pleadings and a hearing on the motion has been conducted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/30/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment
Tue 03/28 6:22 AM
PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by BancorpSouth Bank re7 Motion for Writ,.(aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Specific Collateral | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 03/27 2:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Floyd Lebleu on March 24, 2017, filed by BancorpSouth Bank.(aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/27 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by BancorpSouth Bank. Premiere Inc served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event. See document 8 to view PDF image. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 3/27/2017 (ThomasSld, T) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Writ
Fri 03/24 4:50 PM
Amended MOTION for Writ of Sequestration with Hearing by BancorpSouth Bank. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Verification of First Amended Motion for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration with Hearing, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum / Brief in Support of First Amended Motion for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration with Hearing | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 03/21 4:00 PM
ORDER re5 MOTION for Writ of Sequestration filed by BancorpSouth Bank. IT IS ORDERED that the Bank is DIRECTED to amend its motion within 10 days by stating clearly whether it seeks the issuance of the writ of sequestration ex parte or whether it wishes this motion be set for a hearing after Premiere has answered the complaint and had an opportunity to respond to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/21/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Writ
Mon 03/20 8:24 PM
MOTION for Writ of Sequestration by BancorpSouth Bank. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Verification of Motion for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Motion for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 9:53 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BancorpSouth Bank identifying Corporate Parent BancorpSouth Inc for BancorpSouth Bank. (aty,Ramos, Steven) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 03/16 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Steven Travis Ramos on behalf of BancorpSouth Bank. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/30/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Thu 03/16 8:26 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Premiere Inc. (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 6:56 AM
COMPLAINT with Verification against Premiere Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3316108) filed by BancorpSouth Bank.(Attorney Steven Travis Ramos added to party BancorpSouth Bank(pty:pla))(aty,Ramos, Steven) Modified to indicate civil cover sheet filed within pdf image of main document on 3/16/2017 (ThomasSld, T) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Verification of Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Loan Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Security Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Financing Statement | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/16 8:25 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,ThomasSld, T) |