Dupre III v. Janeway Law Firm P C
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Foote |
Referred: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00409 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Janeway Law Firm P C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curt Dupre, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/04 3:05 PM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING20 Report and Recommendations; granting6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/4/2017. (crt,Keifer, K) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 10/24 4:13 PM
***CASE Reassigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to the case. Administrative entry due to judgment signed by Judge Foote and for statistical purposes (NEF deselected to counsel). (crt,Whidden, C) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case
Thu 10/05 1:47 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Unassigned District Judge. Judge Rebecca F Doherty no longer assigned to case. All pending motions are referred to the assigned magistrate judge for processing. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 10/02/2017.(crt,Putch, A) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 08/25 10:52 AM
RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to20 Report and Recommendations by Janeway Law Firm P C. (aty,Faulkner, Lindsay) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 08/11 11:35 PM
OBJECTION to20 Report and Recommendations by Curt Dupre, III. Response to Objection to R&R due by 8/25/2017 (aty,Crouch, Katherine) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/31 10:29 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The undersigned recommends that6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Janeway Law Firm P C be GRANTED and Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/28/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely
Mon 07/31 10:36 AM
(FILED IN ERROR- NOT APPLICABLE TO THIS CASE)MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint to cure the deficiencies as outlined, precisely stating what each named defendant did to violate plaintiff's constitutional rights, and alternatively, dismiss those claims or defendants plaintiff is unable to cure through amendment. Pro Se Response due by 8/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/27/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) Modified to reflect filed in error on 7/31/2017 (Chicola, C) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Mon 07/31 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding21 Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely. Action taken: Edited text of entry to reflect Filed in Error - not applicable to this case. (crt,Chicola, C) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/14 1:23 PM
ORDER: The hearing with oral argument set for 7/19/2017 re6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Janeway Law Firm P C is UPSET. the Court will decided the Motion on the parties' briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/14/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/19 11:09 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jose F Gill for Curt Dupre, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/19/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Exhibit
Fri 06/16 12:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re16 MOTION for Jose F. Gill to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3391523) Certificate of Good Standing for Jose Gill by Curt Dupre, III. (aty,Crouch, Katherine) Modified on 6/16/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/16 12:31 PM
MOTION for Jose F. Gill to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3391523) by Curt Dupre, III. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Crouch, Katherine) Modified on 6/16/2017 to create link to17 Certificate of Good Standing. (Putch, A) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 06/13 11:47 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Janeway Law Firm P C. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 06/13 11:46 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/13/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 06/12 5:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by Curt Dupre, III. (aty,Crouch, Katherine) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 06/09 3:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Janeway Law Firm P C.(aty,Faulkner, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed pleading | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Mon 06/12 1:12 PM
Motions Transferred regarding12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Putch, A) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 05/30 7:48 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Curt Dupre, III. (aty,Crouch, Katherine) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Mon 05/22 7:43 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding:6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 7/19/2017 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Referring Motion
Fri 05/19 10:17 AM
MINUTE ENTRY/ORDER REFERRING MOTION:6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Janeway Law Firm P C Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst for report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/19/2017. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Wed 05/10 8:24 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motion day set for 7/21/2017 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/09 3:12 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janeway Law Firm P C. (aty,Faulkner, Lindsay) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 05/09 2:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Janeway Law Firm P C.(aty,Faulkner, Lindsay) Modified on 5/10/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/18 4:02 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Janeway Law Firm P C answer due 5/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/18/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/13 4:11 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Janeway Law Firm P C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(Attorney Lindsay Graham Faulkner added to party Janeway Law Firm P C(pty:dft))(aty,Faulkner, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/30 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curt Dupre, III. Janeway Law Firm P C served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (aty,Crouch, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Fri 03/17 3:01 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janeway Law Firm P C (crt,Keller, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 7:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Janeway Law Firm, P.C. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3317277) filed by Curt Dupre III.(Attorney Katherine Zabetti Crouch added to party Curt Dupre III(pty:pla))(aty,Crouch, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - March 21, 2016 FDCPA Notice Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - March 21, 2016 Notice of Acceleration Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed summons/writ | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 2:54 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Keller, J) |