Hayward v. Seventh Avenue, et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Nanette K Laughrey |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04048 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seventh Avenue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mindy Hayward
208 Caribou Dr.
Columbia, MO 65202 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
TransUnion, LLC
Terminated: 05/25/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 06/27 11:34 AM
Order of Dismissal. The above-styled action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event, however, that the settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that such motion is filed within 45 days of the date of this Order. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over enforcement of the settlement agreed to by the parties. Signed on 6/27/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/23 4:06 PM
STATUS REPORT Post Mediation by Mindy Hayward. (Hoorfar, Camron) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 06/08 4:06 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Seventh Avenue by Mindy Hayward (Hoorfar, Camron) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/31 10:07 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal With Prejudice by TransUnion, LLC. (Meyers, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/24 1:04 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
adr
Designation of Mediator
Fri 05/19 5:34 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Phil Miller(Davis, Timothy) |
|
31 | 31
discov
Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
Fri 05/19 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Camron L. Hoorfar on behalf of Plaintiff Mindy Hayward.(Hoorfar, Camron) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/12 4:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Seventh Avenue.(Davis, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/10 1:10 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
adr
Designation of Mediator
Fri 05/05 4:59 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Phil Miller(Davis, Timothy) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/28 11:12 AM
ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Calla, Diana) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 04/27 9:52 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Trans Union, LLC by Mindy Hayward (Hoorfar, Camron) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/27 9:46 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Camron L. Hoorfar on behalf of Mindy Hayward (Attorney Camron L. Hoorfar added to party Mindy Hayward(pty:pla))(Hoorfar, Camron) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Rules of trial
Mon 04/24 9:40 AM
RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 4/24/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 9:39 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/25/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2018 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 4/24/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
Att: 1 Memo on PTC | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 04/20 6:17 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Calla, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 04/05 1:05 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Mon 04/03 3:30 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/03 3:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
20 | 20
order
Rule 16 Notice
Mon 04/03 2:32 PM
ORDER. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/20/2017. Signed on 4/3/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
19 | 19
order
Notice of Pretrial Procedure
Mon 04/03 2:31 PM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 4/3/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
18 | 18
order
Letter of reassignment
Mon 04/03 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a change in Judge assignment only. The case number shall now read 2:17-cv-4048-NKL. Text entry only. No document attached. (Geiser, Angel) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/03 10:19 AM
ORDER granting14 Defendant Seventh Avenue, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed on 4/3/2017 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Beaver, Cameron) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/03 10:17 AM
ORDER granting9 Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed on 4/3/2017 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Beaver, Cameron) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment
Mon 04/03 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT electronically mailed to attorney for defendant Seventh Avenue. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/24/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Fri 03/31 4:51 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Timothy John Davis on behalf of Defendant Seventh Avenue.(Davis, Timothy) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 03/31 4:49 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time To File a Responsive Pleading filed by Timothy John Davis on behalf of Seventh Avenue. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/14/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Davis, Timothy) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/31 4:45 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Timothy John Davis on behalf of Seventh Avenue (Attorney Timothy John Davis added to party Seventh Avenue(pty:dft))(Davis, Timothy) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/31 9:42 AM
Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses on behalf of TransUnion, LLC.(Meyers, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 10:56 AM
ORDER granting10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Diana Calla for Experian Information Solutions Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed [LINK:ECF Registration Form] to 80 Lafayette Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/28 3:59 PM
Motion to allow Diana Calla to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5230641) filed by J. Todd Applegate on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Applegate, J.) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 03/27 1:20 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by J. Todd Applegate on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Applegate, J.) |
|
8 | 8
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Mon 03/27 1:13 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by J. Todd Applegate on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Applegate, J.) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/27 1:07 PM
NOTICE of appearance by J. Todd Applegate on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attorney J. Todd Applegate added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Applegate, J.) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment
Mon 03/27 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT mailed electronically to attorney for defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/17/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/23 2:14 PM
ORDER granting5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Andrew S. Meyers for TransUnion, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed [LINK:ECF Registration Form] to 80 Lafayette Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 1:37 PM
Motion to allow Andrew S. Meyers to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5223703) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of TransUnion, LLC. (Lubben, Todd) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 03/17 10:56 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal executed by State Court by TransUnion, LLC (Lubben, Todd) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of MAPN
Thu 03/16 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Geiser, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Thu 03/16 12:19 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant TransUnion, LLC.(Lubben, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 12:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County, case number 17BA-CV00764, filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of TransUnion, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-5215755.(Lubben, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment
Thu 03/16 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to attorney for plaintiff (Jacob Wilson) and attorney for defendant (Todd Lubben). This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/6/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel) Modified on 3/16/2017 (Geiser, Angel) |