Burton v. Flagstar Bank FSB
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Gary A Fenner |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00193 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Flagstar Bank FSB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie M Burton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 12/13 8:40 AM
Order of Dismissal. Signed on 12/13/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/12 6:38 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by Stephanie M Burton. (Kephart, Susan) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Thu 12/07 8:57 PM
STATUS REPORT by Stephanie M Burton. (Kephart, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Wed 11/08 10:53 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file their joint stipulation of dismissal or status report re29 Status Report filed by Flagstar Bank FSB. Stipulation of Dismissal or Status Report due by 12/7/2017. Signed on 11/8/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Tue 11/07 8:45 PM
STATUS REPORT by Flagstar Bank FSB. (Canter, Anne) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Fri 09/08 8:30 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file their joint stipulation of dismissal orStatus Report by 11/7/2017. Signed on 9/8/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 09/07 3:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendant's answer has not been filed.Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2017. Signed on 9/7/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/28 10:59 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Flagstar Bank FSB answer due 9/1/2017. Signed on 8/28/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/25 12:04 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re24 Amended Complaint, filed by Anne Michelle Canter on behalf of Flagstar Bank FSB. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Canter, Anne) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/11 5:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Flagstar Bank FSB filed by Susan Kephart on behalf of Stephanie M Burton.(Kephart, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - First Trustee's Deed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Second Trustee's Deed | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 08/02 9:07 AM
ORDER granting20 motion to file first amended complaint. Signed on 8/2/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 08/01 4:28 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Flagstar Bank FSB. (Canter, Anne) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/27 10:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why plaintiff's motion to amend complaint20 should not be granted.Show Cause Response due by 8/6/2017. Signed on 7/27/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 07/12 10:52 AM
MOTION to amend/correct1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Petition, removed from Clay County, Missouri Circuit Court filed by Susan Kephart on behalf of Stephanie M Burton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/26/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kephart, Susan) Modified on 7/12/2017. Filer attempted to file the document on 7/11/2017 but was unable to do so due to a problem in ECF and an email was sent to the Court at 11:07 pm regarding the issue. The issue was resolved on 7/12/2017 and the filer was able to file the document. Because the problem in ECF resulted in the document being filed on 7/12/2017, the file date was changed to 7/11/2017. (Jones, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/31 1:01 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/30 3:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2018. Pretrial Conference via telephone to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel set for 6/22/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2018. Signed on 5/30/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
18 | 18
order
Rules of trial
Tue 05/30 3:39 PM
RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 5/30/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 05/30 3:24 PM
ORDER granting12 motion for extension of time to file Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; granting14 motion for extension of time to file designation of mediator. Signed on 5/30/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
16 | 16
adr
Designation of Mediator
Tue 05/30 3:12 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Charles E. Atwell(Kephart, Susan) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
Fri 05/26 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Anne Michelle Canter on behalf of Defendant Flagstar Bank FSB.(Canter, Anne) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/25 11:58 PM
MOTION for extension of time to May 30, 2017 to schedule mediation and file Designation of Mediator filed by Susan Kephart on behalf of Stephanie M Burton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/8/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kephart, Susan) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
Thu 05/25 11:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Susan Kephart on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie M Burton.(Kephart, Susan) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 05/22 8:27 PM
MOTION for extension of time to May 25, 2017 to provide Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and file designation of mediator filed by Susan Kephart on behalf of Stephanie M Burton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/5/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kephart, Susan) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 05/22 8:24 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER /Discovery Plan and Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting by Stephanie M Burton. (Kephart, Susan) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/19 10:56 AM
ORDER granting9 motion for extension of time.Proposed scheduling order due by 5/22/2017. Signed on 5/19/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/18 9:03 PM
MOTION for extension of time to May 22, 2017 to file the parties' proposed scheduling order/discovery plan filed by Susan Kephart on behalf of Stephanie M Burton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/1/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kephart, Susan) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/08 5:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Flagstar Bank FSB.(Canter, Anne) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/26 10:21 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Flagstar Bank FSB answer due 5/8/2017. Proposed scheduling order due 5/18/17. Signed on 4/26/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Tue 04/25 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on as Document No. 6. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Moore, Terri) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/24 5:33 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer and Motion to Extend Certain Rule 26 Deadlines filed by Anne Michelle Canter on behalf of Flagstar Bank FSB. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/8/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Canter, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 03/28 8:56 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Flagstar Bank FSB answer due 4/24/2017. Signed on 3/28/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 03/27 3:52 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Anne Michelle Canter on behalf of Flagstar Bank FSB. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Canter, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 03/22 1:02 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Rule 16 Notice
Mon 03/20 2:20 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/4/2017. Rule 26 conference due by 4/24/2017. Signed on 3/20/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPN
Fri 03/17 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 9:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clay County Circuit Court County, case number 17CY-CV00772, filed by Anne Michelle Canter on behalf of Flagstar Bank FSB. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-5216615.(Canter, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |