JRI HOLDINGS v. York Innovators Group, LLC et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Roseann Ketchmark |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-03074 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
Foundry Systems Innovations, LLC
25 N. Duke Street
York, PA 17404 |
|
Defendant
York Innovators Group, LLC
2130 Pennsylvania Avenue
York, PA 17404 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Berks Research and Development, LLC
1169 Old Mill Lane
Wyomissing, PA 19610 |
|
Defendant
Berks Research, LLC
1169 Old Mill Lane
Wyomissing, PA 19610 |
|
Plaintiff
JRI HOLDINGS
1339 N. Cedarbrook Avenue
Springfield, MO 65802 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 03/06 11:40 AM
Having been notified of the settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Courts determination, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event, however, that the settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that such motion is filed within 45 days of the date of this Order. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over enforcement of the settlement agreed to by the parties. Signed on 3/6/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stout, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 02/01 4:32 PM
ORDER granting35 motion for extension of time. Jurisdictional discovery period to close on March 3, 2018. Signed on 2/1/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stout, Courtney) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 02/01 2:37 PM
MOTION for extension of time filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of JRI HOLDINGS. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/15/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 01/10 2:04 PM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
adr
Designation of Mediator
Tue 01/09 2:28 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/27 3:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JRI HOLDINGS filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Plaintiff JRI HOLDINGS.(Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
adr
Designation of Mediator
Thu 12/14 12:27 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 12/06 10:19 AM
ORDER denying22 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Parties are to engage in an expedited sixty-day jurisdictional discovery period to close on February 4, 2018. Signed on 12/6/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Thu 11/16 10:26 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by JRI HOLDINGS. Berks Research, LLC served on 10/24/2017, answer due 11/14/2017. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
29 | 29
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Thu 11/16 10:20 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by JRI HOLDINGS. Berks Research and Development, LLC served on 10/24/2017, answer due 11/14/2017. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply Suggestions to Motion
Fri 11/03 12:42 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re22 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in support filed by Keith R Dutill on behalf of Defendant York Innovators Group, LLC. (Dutill, Keith) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 11/02 1:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/4/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Discovery due by 10/1/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2018. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:00 AM Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2019 10:00 AM Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2019 09:00 AM in (VJC), Springfield before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on 11/2/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Wed 10/25 10:24 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by JRI HOLDINGS. Foundry Systems Innovations, LLC served on 10/18/2017, answer due 11/8/2017. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 10/20 2:43 PM
ORDER finding as moot8 Defendant York Innovators Group, LLC's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint, and Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss the amended complaint, rendering8 moot. Signed on 10/20/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Perry, Madison) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/20 1:16 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re22 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in support filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Plaintiff JRI HOLDINGS. Reply suggestions due by 11/3/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 10/13 4:00 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Order by JRI HOLDINGS. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 10/09 9:56 AM
MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in support filed by Keith R Dutill on behalf of York Innovators Group, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/23/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Dutill, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 10/06 11:26 AM
ORDER. In accordance with Local Rule 26.1(c)(2), the parties shall refile their20 Proposed Scheduling Order by 10/13/2017 and "provide an explanation sufficiently detailed to inform the Court why the period of time proposed for completing discovery is necessary[.]" In addition, proposed orders should not contain a judge's signature line per administrative rule. Signed on 10/6/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russell, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 10/05 3:40 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by JRI HOLDINGS. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/05 2:37 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Berks Research and Development, LLC, Berks Research, LLC, Foundry Systems Innovations, LLC. (Schroeppel, Kerry) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 09/25 9:29 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 09/22 1:38 PM
ORDER finding as moot15 motion to amend/correct; granting17 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint and for an extension of time to provide a proposed scheduling order. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint within five (5) days of the date of this Order. The parties' proposed scheduling order is due by 10/6/2017. Signed on 9/22/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russell, Elizabeth) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 09/22 4:30 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 9/27/2017. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/6/2017, per Order (doc. 18 ) (Wheeler, LaTandra) |
||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/01 3:31 PM
MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/15/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. A to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. C to Amended Complaint | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Thu 08/31 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/29/2017 as Document No. 17, AMENDED COMPLAINT. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel shall refile the correct document in accordance to the Court's Order (doc. 16), filed 08/22/17 wherein, counsel is to provide the Amended Complaint as an exhibit attachment to it's supplemental motion. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/29 2:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of JRI HOLDINGS.(Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 08/22 3:34 PM
ORDER. In accordance with Local Rule 15.1(a), on or before 8/29/2017, Plaintiff is to supplement its motion15 with the proposed amended pleading. Signed on August 22, 2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 08/16 11:41 AM
MOTION to amend/correct1 Complaint, and for an Extension of Time to Provide a Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of JRI HOLDINGS. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/04 8:48 AM
ORDER finding as moot10 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's Suggestions in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss was filed on 7/17/17 (Doc.10). Signed on August 4, 2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Mon 07/31 10:12 AM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Defendant York Innovators Group, LLC.(Hammons, John) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 07/19 1:03 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/17 4:54 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re8 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction And Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendant, York Innovators Group, LLC to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Craig F. Lowther on behalf of Plaintiff JRI HOLDINGS. Reply suggestions due by 7/31/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lowther, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Jim Jones | ||
11 | 11
order
Rule 16 Notice
Mon 07/17 2:57 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/17/2017. Rule 26 conference due by 8/7/2017. Signed on 7/17/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Perry, Madison) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/12 2:03 PM
MOTION for extension of time to File Suggestions in Opposition to Defendant YIG's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/26/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 12:24 PM
ORDER granting7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Keith R Dutill for York Innovators Group, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed [LINK:ECF Registration Form] to 1400 U.S. Courthouse, 222 John Q. Hammons Parkway, Springfield, Missouri 65806. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 07/03 2:57 PM
MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction And Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendant, York Innovators Group, LLC to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of York Innovators Group, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/17/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hammons, John) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/03 2:52 PM
Motion to allow Keith R. Dutill to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5348018) filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of York Innovators Group, LLC. (Attorney John D. Hammons, Jr added to party York Innovators Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Hammons, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Response to order
Tue 06/27 4:38 PM
RESPONSE to order re5 Order to Show Cause, filed by Craig F. Lowther on behalf of Plaintiff JRI HOLDINGS. (Lowther, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 06/15 1:46 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why its action should not be dismissed for failure to provide proof of service to the Court. Show Cause Response due by 6/29/2017. Failure to show cause will result in dismissal without further notice. Signed on 6/15/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (DO) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/09 4:04 PM
STIPULATION by JRI HOLDINGS. (Lowther, Craig) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 10:14 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED, and e-mailed to counsel for Plaintiff, as to Foundry Systems Innovations, LLC, and York Innovators Group, LLC. (Keller, Jeanne) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 2:30 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Craig F. Lowther on behalf of JRI HOLDINGS (Lowther, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPN
Thu 03/16 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Schroeppel, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:02 PM
COMPLAINT against JRI HOLDINGS JRI HOLDINGS. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5215966. Service due by 6/14/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Fax, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |